USA v. Malik et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Samriti Malik and Rishi Malik
Case Number: 3:2019cv00976
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Samriti Malik served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Payton, R.)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Janet C. Hall for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/11/2019. (Shafer, J.)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Transfer Case to Judge Hall. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/11/2019. (Lindberg, Christina)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge by USA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Sciarrino, Christine)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Rishi Malik, Samriti Malik* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Christine L. Sciarrino* *U.S. Attorney's Office-NH* *157 Church St., 25th Floor* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Shafer, J.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint, #5 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, and #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 6/24/2019. (Shafer, J.)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/21/2019. (Shafer, J.)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/21/2019. (Shafer, J.)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/21/2019. (Shafer, J.)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/20/2019; Discovery due by 12/21/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 1/25/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/21/2019. (Shafer, J.)
June 21, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 21, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Sciarrino, Christine)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rishi Malik, Samriti Malik, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sciarrino, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Malik et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Christine L. Sciarrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samriti Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rishi Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?