Marckenson v. Evbagharu et al
Plaintiff: Colin Marckenson
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc. and Uwadia Harry Evbagharu
Case Number: 3:2019cv00985
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina L. Albano on behalf of Colin Marckenson (Albano, Christina)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina L. Albano on behalf of Colin Marckenson (Albano, Christina)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by C.R. England, Inc. 06-26-19-Colin-Certificate of Service of Courts Standing Orders and Other E-filed Documents at the Commencement of Removed Case (Valauri, Matthew)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses Answer of The Defendant C.R. England Inc to the Plaintiffs Complaint by C.R. England, Inc..(Valauri, Matthew)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by C.R. England, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by C.R. England, Inc., #7 Standing Protective Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by C.R. England, Inc., #3 Notice of Appearance filed by C.R. England, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Velez, F.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2019. (Velez, F.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/24/2019. (Velez, F.) Modified on 6/26/2019 to correct filing date (Velez, F.).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/24/2019. (Velez, F.) Modified on 6/26/2019 to correct filing date (Velez, F.).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/24/2019. (Velez, F.) Modified on 6/26/2019 to correct filing date (Velez, F.).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/24/2019; Discovery due by 12/25/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/24/2019. (Velez, F.) Modified on 6/26/2019 to correct filing date and update deadlines (Velez, F.).
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C.R. England, Inc. (Anastasio, F.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Valauri on behalf of C.R. England, Inc. (Anastasio, F.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Beata Shapiro on behalf of C.R. England, Inc. (Anastasio, F.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by C.R. England, Inc. from Superior Court J.D. Fairfield at Bridgeport. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5332730, filed by C.R. England, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anastasio, F.) Modified to include filing fee on 6/25/2019 (Anastasio, F.).
June 24, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marckenson v. Evbagharu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Marckenson
Represented By: Christina L. Albano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew David Valauri
Represented By: Beata Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uwadia Harry Evbagharu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?