Adams v. Deal et al
Plaintiff: Bobbie L. Adams, III.
Defendant: John L. Salomone, Brown Jacobson PC and Karlene M. Deal
Case Number: 3:2019cv00994
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2019 Filing 19 OBJECTION re #16 MOTION Seeking Class Action Status filed by Brown Jacobson PC. (Langhammer, Lloyd)
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gerarde, Thomas)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Appoint Counsel. A plaintiff in a civil case is not entitled to appointment of counsel on request and the Second Circuit repeatedly cautions against the routine appointment of counsel. See, e.g., Hendricks v. Coughlin, 114 F.3d 390, 393 (2d Cir. 1997); Cooper v. A. Sargenti Co., 877 F.2d 170, 172 (2d Cir. 1989). Insofar as volunteer lawyer time is not always readily available, a plaintiff seeking appointment of counsel must show first that he sought counsel and has been unable to obtain it. McDonald v. Head Criminal Court Supervisor Officer, 850 F.2d 121, 123 (2d Cir. 1988). Once a plaintiff has made this showing, he must then demonstrate that his complaint passes the test of likely merit. Cooper, 877 F.2d at 173. He must demonstrate that the claims in the complaint have a sufficient basis to justify appointing a volunteer lawyer to pursue them. Notably, even where a claim is not frivolous, counsel is often unwarranted where the [plaintiffs] chances of success are extremely slim. Id. at 171. Here, Plaintiff makes no showing as to any efforts to secure counsel. In addition, at this juncture, based solely upon the pleadings filed, the court cannot ascertain whether the Plaintiff's claims have likely merit. The Motion for Appointment of Counsel is therefore denied without prejudice should the facts that develop through the litigation permit reassessment of this issue and Plaintiff can demonstrate that efforts to secure counsel have proven unsuccessful. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/7/19. (Dooley, Kari)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION Seeking Class Action Status by Bobbie L. Adams, III. Responses due by 8/15/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Bobbie L. Adams, III. (Fanelle, N.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lloyd L. Langhammer on behalf of Brown Jacobson PC (Langhammer, Lloyd)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Karlene M. Deal, John L. Salomone.(Gerarde, Thomas)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice of Appearance filed by John L. Salomone, Karlene M. Deal, #11 Protective Order, #6 Notice (Other) filed by John L. Salomone, Karlene M. Deal, #7 Notice (Other) filed by John L. Salomone, Karlene M. Deal, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by John L. Salomone, Karlene M. Deal, #4 Jury Demand filed by John L. Salomone, Karlene M. Deal, #10 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Notice (Other) filed by John L. Salomone, Karlene M. Deal, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal filed by John L. Salomone, Karlene M. Deal, #5 Notice (Other) filed by John L. Salomone, Karlene M. Deal. Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Fanelle, N.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/25/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/25/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/24/2019 Discovery due by 12/25/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2020 Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/25/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
June 25, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Karlene M. Deal, John L. Salomone re #1 Notice of Removal (Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal) (Gerarde, Thomas)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Karlene M. Deal, John L. Salomone re #1 Notice of Removal (Notice to Counsel Re Local Rule 5(b)) (Gerarde, Thomas)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Karlene Deal, John L Salomone re #1 Notice of Removal (Compliance With Standing Order in Removed Cases) (Gerarde, Thomas)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Karlene Deal, John L Salomone re #1 Notice of Removal (Notice of Pending Motions) (Gerarde, Thomas)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Karlene Deal, John L Salomone. (Gerarde, Thomas)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin Kontyko on behalf of Karlene Deal, John L Salomone (Kontyko, Kaitlin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Gerarde on behalf of Karlene Deal, John L Salomone (Gerarde, Thomas)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John L Salomone, Karlene Deal from JD of New London, case number KNL-CV19-5020359-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5334354, filed by John L Salomone, Karlene Deal.(Gerarde, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Deal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Salomone
Represented By: Kaitlin Kontyko
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown Jacobson PC
Represented By: Lloyd L. Langhammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karlene M. Deal
Represented By: Kaitlin Kontyko
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie L. Adams, III.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?