Caires v. Chase Insurance Agency, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Caires
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc. and Chase Insurance Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01003
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Referring Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 19 RECOMMENDED RULING. For the reasons set forth in the attached Recommended Ruling, the Court recommends that plaintiff's #17 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint be DENIED, and that this matter be DISMISSED, without prejudice. If plaintiff disagrees with the recommendations in this Ruling, he must file an objection on or before August 26, 2019. Failure to file an objection by this deadline will preclude appellate review. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 8/7/2019. (Katz, S.)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for motions including #17 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint, #16 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/31/2019.Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Lewis, D)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint by Richard Caires.Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Payton, R.)
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Caires. (Payton, R.)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: Plaintiff, Richard Caires, (Caires) filed a Notice of Bankruptcy Filing on July 16, 2019 (Doc. No. 14). Caires is put on notice that his most recent bankruptcy filing does not stay the deadlines set forth by Judge Merriam in her Order to Show Cause (Doc. No. 13) and Order terminating #1 Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. No. 12). If Caires fails to respond by the deadlines set forth by the court, this case will be dismissed. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/18/2019. (DeRubeis, B.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing by Richard Caires (Payton, R.)
July 2, 2019 Set Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 7/30/2019 (Caffrey, A.)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to show cause why the Complaint (Doc. #2 ) should not be dismissed based on the expiration of the applicable statutes of limitations. Show Cause Response due by 7/30/2019. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 7/2/2019. (Katz, S.)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER terminating #1 Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If plaintiff wishes to proceed in this matter without paying fees and costs, he shall re-file his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on this District's form motion, a copy of which is attached to this Order. Alternatively, plaintiff may choose to pay the applicable filing fee. Plaintiff shall either re-file his motion or pay the filing fee on or before July 23, 2019. Failure to either re-file his motion or pay the filing fee may result in the dismissal of this case. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 7/2/2019. (Katz, S.)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for for review of the Complaint pursuant to 28 USC 1915 including #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/2/2019.Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Lewis, D)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for motion including #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/27/2019.Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Lewis, D)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/26/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/26/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2019 Discovery due by 12/26/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/2020 Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Case Electronically transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01236.
June 20, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Order, to Richard Caires 634 North St Greenwich, CT 06830. (aea)
June 19, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Connecticut (mro)
June 19, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (mro)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/19/2019) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from R. Caires, dated 4/4/19 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that, as of today, this case has not been assigned, and that he requests that the Court assign the case and give him some guidance of the timing of this process. Document filed by Richard Caires.(sc)
February 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Chase Insurance Agency, Inc., J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc.. Document filed by Richard Caires.(rdz) Modified on 6/26/2019 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Richard Caires.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caires v. Chase Insurance Agency, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Custody Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Caires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?