Bennett v. Career Resources, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Stacy-Ann A. Bennett
Defendant: American Job Centers, Lockheed Martin Corporation and Career Resources, Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01006
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Referring Judge: Kari A Dooley
2 Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Set Deadline: Amended Complaint due by 9/6/2019. See 15 Order. (Bozek, M.)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION RE: 15 ORDER: The court adopts #9 recommended ruling denying, without prejudice, the plaintiff's #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing #1 the complaint, without prejudice to the plaintiff filing an amended complaint, on or before September 6, 2019, alleging a sufficient basis for the court's jurisdiction. The court denies the plaintiff's #3 motion for preliminary injunction; #12 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and #13 motion for appointment of counsel, all without prejudice to refiling after the plaintiff files an amended complaint.. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/6/2019.; modified to reflect ruling on motions (Bozek, M.)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The court adopts #9 recommended ruling denying, without prejudice, the plaintiff's #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing #1 the complaint, without prejudice to the plaintiff filing an amended complaint, on or before September 6, 2019, alleging a sufficient basis for the court's jurisdiction. The court denies the plaintiff's #3 motion for preliminary injunction; #12 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and #13 motion for appointment of counsel, all without prejudice to refiling after the plaintiff files an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/6/2019.(Covello, Alfred)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #9 Recommended Ruling filed by Stacy-Ann A. Bennett. (Fanelle, N.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Stacy-Ann A. Bennett. (Fanelle, N.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stacy-Ann A. Bennett. (Fanelle, N.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 OBJECTION to #9 Recommended Ruling filed by Stacy-Ann A. Bennett. (Fanelle, N.)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Alfred V. Covello for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/03/2019.(Gould, K.)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RECOMMENDED RULING. For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, the Court recommends that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) be DENIED, without prejudice. The Court further recommends, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), the Complaint (Doc. #1 ) be DISMISSED, without prejudice. This is a recommended ruling. Any objections to this recommended ruling must be filed with the Clerk of the Court within fourteen (14) days of being served with this order. Failure to object within fourteen (14) days will preclude further review. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 7/1/19.(Dowie, C)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for Ruling on motion including #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and for review of the complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/28/2019.Motion referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Gould, K.)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Discovery attachment) (Oliver, T.)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/26/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/26/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2019 Discovery due by 12/26/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/2020 Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Stacy-Ann A. Bennett. Responses due by 7/17/2019 (Oliver, T.)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stacy-Ann A. Bennett. (Oliver, T.)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Job Centers, Career Resources, Inc, Lockheed Martin Corporation, filed by Stacy-Ann A. Bennett. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. Career Resources, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Job Centers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Career Resources, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy-Ann A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?