Zayas v. Sylvan R. Shemitz Designs Inc
Plaintiff: Marcelino Zayas
Defendant: Sylvan R. Shemitz Designs Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01007
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sylvan R. Shemitz Designs Inc waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019 filed by Sylvan R. Shemitz Designs Inc. (Corbett, David)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Corbett on behalf of Sylvan R. Shemitz Designs Inc (Corbett, David)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Martyn Philpot, Jr on behalf of Marcelino Zayas (Philpot, W.)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Notice, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Marcelino Zayas, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 6/27/2019.(Pipech, L.)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment). (Pipech, L.)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/26/2019.(Pipech, L.)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/26/2019.(Pipech, L.)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2019; Discovery due by 12/26/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2019.(Pipech, L.)
June 26, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sylvan R. Shemitz Designs Inc ( Filing fee $400 receipt number BCTDC-5336295.), filed by Marcelino Zayas.(Philpot, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zayas v. Sylvan R. Shemitz Designs Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcelino Zayas
Represented By: W. Martyn Philpot, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvan R. Shemitz Designs Inc
Represented By: David A. Corbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?