Derby et al v. Thompson
Plaintiff: City of Derby and City of Derby Water Pollution Control
Defendant: Mel Thompson
Case Number: 3:2019cv01028
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 Case remanded to State Court Judicial District of Ansonia-Milford. (Fanelle, N.)
July 30, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fanelle, N.)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REMAND. Preliminarily, the Court notes that the Plaintiffs filed a motion to remand this action to state court for, among other things, lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (ECF No. 11.) Prior to the filing of Plaintiffs' motion, the Court had already decided to remand the matter sua sponte for the reasons set forth below. The self-represented defendant, Melvin Thompson, (the "Defendant") removed this action from the Connecticut Superior Court on June 28, 2019. See Derby et al v. Thompson, No. AAN-CV-19-6033771-S. Federal courts have subject matter jurisdiction over only matters in which a federal question is raised or there is diversity of citizenship. See 28 U.S.C. 1331,1332. Federal question jurisdiction exists where the action "aris[es] under the Constitution, laws or treaties of the United States." 28 U.S.C. 1331. "[A] suit 'arises under' federal law 'only when the plaintiff's statement of his own cause of action shows that it is based upon federal law.'" Vaden v. Discover Bank, 556 U.S. 49, 60 (2009) (quoting Louisville & Nashville R. Co. v. Mottley, 211 U.S. 149, 152 (1908)). Diversity jurisdiction exists only where there is complete diversity of citizenship between the parties and the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000. 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). Here, there is no basis for federal question or diversity jurisdiction. The underlying complaint sounds only in foreclosure, and "it is well settled that judgments of foreclosure... are fundamentally matters of state law." Muong v. Fed. Nat. Mortgage Ass'n, No. 13-cv-06564 (KAM), 2013 WL 6667374, at *2 (E.D.N.Y. Dec. 16, 2013) (collecting cases). The Defendant contends that this Court has original jurisdiction over this matter because he intends to assert several counterclaims under the United States Constitution, but federal jurisdiction cannot be predicated on actual or anticipated defenses or counterclaims. Vaden, 556 U.S. at 60. Diversity jurisdiction, though not asserted, is also lacking both because the plaintiff and the defendant are both citizens of Connecticut. In addition, "[a] state court case is not removable... based solely on diversity jurisdiction if any defendant is a citizen of the state in which the action is brought." Wells Fargo Bank, Nat'l Ass'n v. White, No. 3:17-cv-00858 (VAB), 2018 WL 650372, at *2 (D. Conn. Jan. 31, 2018) (citing 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)(2)). For the foregoing reasons, the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over this case, and it is remanded back to the Connecticut Superior Court, judicial district of Ansonia-Milford. Royal Ins. Co. v. Jones, 76 F. Supp. 2d 202, 204 (D. Conn. 1999) ("a court lacking subject matter jurisdiction over a removed action must remand that action to state court sua sponte or on motion"); see United Food & Commercial Workers Union, Local 919, AFL-CIO v. CenterMark Props. Meriden Square, Inc., 30 F.3d 298, 301 (2d Cir. 1994) (recognizing that lack of subject matter jurisdiction may be raised sua sponte by the court and that "[w]here jurisdiction is lacking... dismissal is mandatory"). The Clerk of the Court is directed to: (1) remand this matter to the Connecticut Superior Court, judicial district of Ansonia-Milford, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c), and (2) close this case. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/29/2019.(Beyerlein, Alexis)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Derby Water Pollution Control, City of Derby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Dobin, David)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by City of Derby Water Pollution Control, City of Derby.Responses due by 8/16/2019 (Dobin, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David Erez Dobin on behalf of City of Derby Water Pollution Control, City of Derby (Dobin, David)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:18-CV-00793-KAD by Mel Thompson. Responses due by 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Fanelle, N.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against City of Derby Water Pollution Control, City of Derby, filed by Mel Thompson.(Fazekas, J.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 7/1/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal filed by Mel Thompson, #2 Counterclaim filed by Mel Thompson, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Standing Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/28/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/28/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/27/2019. Discovery due by 12/28/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/28/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 COUNTERCLAIM against City of Derby Water Pollution Control, City of Derby, filed by Mel Thompson.(Fazekas, J.)
June 28, 2019 Filing fee received from Melvin Thompson: $400.00, receipt number 467914. (Fazekas, J.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mel Thompson from Superior Court, Ansonia/Milford, case number AAN-CV19-6033771-S., filed by Mel Thompson.(Fazekas, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2019: #1 ADDED PDF - Civil Cover Sheet) (Fazekas, J.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derby et al v. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Derby
Represented By: David Erez Dobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Derby Water Pollution Control
Represented By: David Erez Dobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mel Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?