Gonzalez-Cuevas v. Glover et al
Plaintiff: Arhely Gonzalez-Cuevas
Defendant: ABF Freight System, Inc. and James Glover
Case Number: 3:2019cv01034
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/9/2019. 10 minutes (Constantine, A.)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER : The time of the conference call with Judge Martinez on Friday, 8/9/2019 is changed from 4:00 PM to 3:00 PM. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and must have opposing counsel on the line when calling chambers at (860) 240 3605. (Constantine, A.)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER : This case was referred to Judge Martinez for a settlement conference. Judge Martinez will hold a telephonic conference with counsel on Friday, 8/9/2019 at 4:00 PM to discuss scheduling of the settlement conference. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and must have opposing counsel on the line when calling chambers at (860) 240 3605. Parties or their representatives with settlement authority will be ordered to attend the settlement conference. Prior to the telephone conference, counsel shall obtain any dates in the next 90 days when counsel or their clients are unavailable. If there is any discovery or other information that must be exchanged in order for the settlement conference to be productive, counsel should be prepared to discuss it. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 8/5/2019.(Constantine, A.)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez to confer with the parties and enter the scheduling order required by F.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and to conduct a settlement conference. So ordered by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/2/2019.(Pipech, L.)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kenney, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter George Karayiannis on behalf of Arhely Gonzalez-Cuevas (Karayiannis, Peter)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #5 Electronic Service Documents, Response to 5-1 - Standing Order for Cases Removed from Superior Court filed by ABF Freight System, Inc., James Glover. (Kenney, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABF Freight System, Inc., James Glover identifying Corporate Parent ArcBest Corporation for ABF Freight System, Inc.. (Kenney, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by James Glover, ABF Freight System, Inc., #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 07/02/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 06/28/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/28/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/28/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/27/2019. Discovery due by 12/28/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2020. Signed by Clerk on 06/28/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
June 28, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ABF Freight System, Inc., James Glover from Connecticut Superior Court, J.D. of Fairfield at Bridgeport, case number Not yet assigned. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5340417, filed by ABF Freight System, Inc., James Glover.(Kenney, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez-Cuevas v. Glover et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arhely Gonzalez-Cuevas
Represented By: Peter George Karayiannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABF Freight System, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Glover
Represented By: Michael P. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?