Leigh et al v. Evolution Sport Bar LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Bernstein, Nikki Leigh and Rachel Koren
Defendant: Diomedes Feliz, Evolution Sport Bar LLC and Guido Feliz
Case Number: 3:2019cv01037
Filed: June 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John V. Golaszewski on behalf of Rachel Bernstein, Nikki Leigh (Golaszewski, John)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) John V. Golaszewski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5365418) by Rachel Bernstein, Nikki Leigh. (Radshaw, John)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John V. Golaszewski. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/17/2019. Signed by Clerk on 07/19/2019. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT re #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) John V. Golaszewski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5365418) Signed By John V. Golaszewski filed by Rachel Bernstein, Nikki Leigh. (Radshaw, John)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) John V. Golaszewski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5365418) by Rachel Bernstein, Nikki Leigh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Atty. Golaszewski)(Radshaw, John)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nikki Leigh, Rachel Bernstein. All Defendants. (Radshaw, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Reis, Julia)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Evolution Sport Bar LLC, Diomedes Feliz, Guido Feliz* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John J. Radshaw, III* *900 Chapel Street* *Suite 620* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Reis, Julia)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Rachel Koren, Nikki Leigh, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 7/2/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/29/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/29/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/28/2019 Discovery due by 12/29/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 2/2/2020 Signed by Clerk on 6/29/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 29, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Anastasio, F.)
June 29, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Radshaw, John)
June 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5340670.), filed by Nikki Leigh, Rachel Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Radshaw, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leigh et al v. Evolution Sport Bar LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Bernstein
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki Leigh
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Koren
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diomedes Feliz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evolution Sport Bar LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guido Feliz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?