Cepeda v. ATS LLC of Crossville, TN et al
Plaintiff: Jose Cepeda
Defendant: Michael A Leck and ATS LLC of Crossville, TN
Case Number: 3:2019cv01039
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference is scheduled for 9/10/2019 at 9:30am with Judge Spector. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 90 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. Please use the following dial-in for this call: (877) 873-8017; Access Code: 7040261. (Watson, M.)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector for settlement. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/26/19.(Imbriani, Susan)
August 26, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 8/1/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2020. (Imbriani, Susan)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER approving #17 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery is due August 1, 2020. Dispositive motions are due October 1, 2020. The case will be referred to a magistrate judge for early settlement conference. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/26/19.(Ladd-Smith, I.)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mansfield, Lauren)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 OBJECTION re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ATS LLC of Crossville, TN, Michael A Leck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mansfield, Lauren)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary J. Strickland on behalf of Jose Cepeda (Strickland, Gary)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ATS LLC of Crossville, TN, Michael A Leck. (Mansfield, Lauren)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by ATS LLC of Crossville, TN, Michael A Leck.(Mansfield, Lauren)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jose Cepeda.Responses due by 8/15/2019 (Strickland, Gary)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Jury Demand filed by Michael A Leck, ATS LLC of Crossville, TN, #2 Certificate of Filing filed by Michael A Leck, ATS LLC of Crossville, TN, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher M. Vossler on behalf of Michael A Leck, ATS LLC of Crossville, TN, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Michael A Leck, ATS LLC of Crossville, TN, #3 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Michael A Leck, ATS LLC of Crossville, TN, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #10 Standing Protective Order, #6 Compliance with Standing Orders filed by Michael A Leck, ATS LLC of Crossville, TN, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Lauren E. Mansfield on behalf of Michael A Leck, ATS LLC of Crossville, TN Signed by Clerk on 7/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/1/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/1/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2019. Discovery due by 12/31/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/4/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/1/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 1, 2019 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Anastasio, F.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Vossler on behalf of ATS LLC of Crossville, TN, Michael A Leck (Vossler, Christopher)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by ATS LLC of Crossville, TN, Michael A Leck re #1 Notice of Removal (Compliance with Standing Orders) (Mansfield, Lauren)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ATS LLC of Crossville, TN, Michael A Leck. (Mansfield, Lauren)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren E. Mansfield on behalf of ATS LLC of Crossville, TN, Michael A Leck (Mansfield, Lauren)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by ATS LLC of Crossville, TN, Michael A Leck re #1 Notice of Removal (Notice of Pending Motions) (Mansfield, Lauren)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by ATS LLC of Crossville, TN, Michael A Leck re #1 Notice of Removal (Certificate of Filing) (Mansfield, Lauren)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael A Leck, ATS LLC of Crossville, TN from Waterbury Superior Court Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5342185, filed by Michael A Leck, ATS LLC of Crossville, TN.(Mansfield, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cepeda v. ATS LLC of Crossville, TN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Leck
Represented By: Lauren E. Mansfield
Represented By: Christopher M. Vossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATS LLC of Crossville, TN
Represented By: Lauren E. Mansfield
Represented By: Christopher M. Vossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Cepeda
Represented By: Isaias T. Diaz
Represented By: Gary J. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?