Mirci et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Plaintiff: Vincenzo Mirci and Cladia Mirci
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01053
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 21 Memorandum in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Cannavino, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by American Strategic Insurance Corp..Responses due by 9/16/2019 (Cannavino, John)
August 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 9/5/2019. A TELEPHONIC Pre-Settlement Conference is set for 9/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert M. Spector. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 90 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. Counsel should also be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the conference in order for settlement discussions to be productive. Please use the following conference call number: (877) 873-8017; access code: 7040261. (Stokely, Justyn)
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A TELEPHONIC Pre-Settlement Conference is set for 9/5/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Robert M. Spector. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 90 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. Counsel should also be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference in order for settlement discussions to be productive. Please use the following conference call number: (877) 873-8017; access code: 7040261. (Stokely, Justyn)
August 7, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 7/31/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2020. (Imbriani, Susan)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector for settlement conference. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/7/19.(Imbriani, Susan)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER approving #15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery is due July 31, 2020. Dispositive motions are due October 18, 2020. The case will be referred to a magistrate judge for early settlement conference. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/7/19.(Ladd-Smith, I.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 First REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hall, Sheila)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Carta on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Carta, Raymond)
July 8, 2019 Answer deadline updated for American Strategic Insurance Corp. to 8/26/2019. (Imbriani, Susan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cladia Mirci, Vincenzo Mirci. (Hall, Sheila)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/8/19. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 Docket Entry Correction re #8 Standing Protective Order REPLACEMENT PDF (Fazekas, J.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 Docket Entry Correction re #7 Electronic Filing Order, REPLACEMENT PDF (Fazekas, J.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice of the Filing of Notice in State Court filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp., #3 Notice of Pending Motions filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp., #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/26/19 to Plead filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp., #5 Notice of Statement on Standing Order on Removed Cases filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp., #7 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/3/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2019: #1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Fazekas, J.).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/3/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2019: #1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Fazekas, J.).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2019. Discovery due by 1/2/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/6/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/3/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by American Strategic Insurance Corp. of Statement on Standing Order on Removed Cases (Cannavino, John)
July 3, 2019 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Oliver, T.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/26/19 to Plead by American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Hushin, Z.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by American Strategic Insurance Corp. of Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Cannavino, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by American Strategic Insurance Corp. of the Filing of Notice in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Cannavino, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Strategic Insurance Corp. from Connecticut Superior Court, case number AAN-CV19-6033965-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5346350, filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cannavino, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mirci et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: John Wade Cannavino, Jr.
Represented By: Raymond Carta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincenzo Mirci
Represented By: Sheila J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cladia Mirci
Represented By: Sheila J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?