Fidell v. Army
Plaintiff: Eugene R. Fidell
Defendant: Dept of Army
Case Number: 3:2019cv01069
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dept of Army.(Ikari, Carolyn)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Aiko Ikari on behalf of Dept of Army (Ikari, Carolyn)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Dept of Army served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Dept of Army* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Stephen Wizner* *49 McKinley Avenue* *New Haven, CT 06515*. (Reis, Julia)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Eugene R. Fidell, #2 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 7/16/2019.(Reis, Julia)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/9/2019.(Reis, Julia)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/9/2019.(Reis, Julia)
July 9, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Dept of Army. (Reis, Julia)
July 9, 2019 Filing fee received from Eugene Fidell: $400, receipt number CTXN00019603 (Reis, Julia)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dept of Army, filed by Eugene R. Fidell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reis, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidell v. Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene R. Fidell
Represented By: Stephen Wizner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Army
Represented By: Carolyn Aiko Ikari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?