Carter v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Thomas Carter
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2019cv01082
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/14/2019), Answer deadline updated for Life Insurance Company of North America to 9/23/2019. (Simon, K)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and File Rule 26 Report. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 8/15/2019. (Simon, K)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until September 23, 2019 Complaint #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Begos, Patrick)
August 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Begos, Patrick)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Life Insurance Company of North America* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Hudson Taylor Ellis* *Eric Buchanan & Associates, PLLC* *414 McCallie Ave.* *Chattanooga, TN 37402*. (Oliver, T.)
July 19, 2019 Docket Entry Correction re Request to Issue Summons MODIFIED TO CORRECT THE DATE FILED (Oliver, T.)
July 12, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (Oliver, T.) Modified on 7/19/2019 TO CORRECT THE DATE FILED (Oliver, T.).
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Thomas Carter, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 7/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/10/2019. Discovery due by 1/11/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 12, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5356300.), filed by Thomas Carter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ellis, Hudson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Carter
Represented By: Hudson Taylor Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Patrick Walter Begos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?