Davis v. Zervos et al
Plaintiff: Darnell Davis
Defendant: Zhanna Zervos, Ryan Carino and David Zervos
Case Number: 3:2019cv01117
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Shafer, J.)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as moot in light of Plaintiff's #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/21/2019. (Nault, James)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) with prejudice and without costs or fees to either party in light of Plaintiff's #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/21/2019. (Nault, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Darnell Davis (Berke, Robert)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Darnell Davis.(Berke, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/19/2019. (Velez, F.)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/19/2019. (Velez, F.)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/19/2019. (Velez, F.)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/17/2019; Discovery due by 1/18/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 2/22/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/19/2019. (Velez, F.)
July 19, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Anastasio, F.)
July 19, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Berke, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darnell Davis. (Berke, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Darnell Davis.(Berke, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Zervos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhanna Zervos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Carino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Zervos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Davis
Represented By: Robert M. Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?