Doctor's Associates LLC et al v. Kaur
Plaintiff: Subway IP LLC and Doctor's Associates LLC
Defendant: Manpreet Kaur
Case Number: 3:2019cv01148
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Manpreet Kaur by Doctor's Associates LLC, Subway IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John M. Doroghazi, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Judgment)(Doroghazi, John)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) Motion for default judgment due by 9/22/2019. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a).. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/23/2019. (Lewis, D)
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Manpreet Kaur by Doctor's Associates LLC, Subway IP LLC. (Doroghazi, John)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/15/2019. (Lewis, D)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Doctor's Associates LLC, Subway IP LLC re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Accompanying Proposed Order (Doroghazi, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 Affidavit of Service by Doctor's Associates LLC, Subway IP LLC re #13 Order to Show Cause, Notice of Service (Doroghazi, John) Modified on 8/7/2019 to change event (Reis, Julia).
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doctor's Associates LLC, Subway IP LLC. (Doroghazi, John)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doctor's Associates LLC, Subway IP LLC. Manpreet Kaur served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Doroghazi, John)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant Manpreet Kaur is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why the Proposed Order granting Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. #12 ) should not enter. Show Cause Response due by 8/13/2019 Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/1/2019.(Lewis, D)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Doctor's Associates LLC, Subway IP LLC.Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Exhibits, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Doroghazi, John)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (Reis, Julia)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Manpreet Kaur* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Matthew Doroghazi* *Wiggin & Dana-NH* *One Century Tower, 265 Church Street P.O. Box 1832* *New Haven, CT 06508-1832*. (Reis, Julia)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Subway IP LLC, Doctor's Associates LLC, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Subway IP LLC, Doctor's Associates LLC, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Subway IP LLC, Doctor's Associates LLC, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Subway IP LLC, Doctor's Associates LLC, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Standing Protective Order, #8 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 7/26/2019.(Reis, Julia)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/25/2019.(Reis, Julia)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/25/2019.(Reis, Julia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2019: #1 Replacement PDF) (Reis, Julia).
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/25/2019.(Reis, Julia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2019: #1 Replacement PDF) (Reis, Julia).
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/23/2019 Discovery due by 1/24/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2020 Signed by Clerk on 7/25/2019.(Reis, Julia)
July 25, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David Norman-Schiff on behalf of Doctor's Associates LLC, Subway IP LLC (Norman-Schiff, David)
July 25, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Manpreet Kaur. (Doroghazi, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Doctor's Associates LLC, Subway IP LLC identifying Other Affiliate Subway IP Holdings, LLC for Subway IP LLC; Other Affiliate Subway US Holdings, LLC for Doctor's Associates LLC. (Doroghazi, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Matthew Doroghazi on behalf of Doctor's Associates LLC, Subway IP LLC (Doroghazi, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Manpreet Kaur ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5374017.), filed by Doctor's Associates LLC, Subway IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Doroghazi, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doctor's Associates LLC et al v. Kaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Subway IP LLC
Represented By: John Matthew Doroghazi
Represented By: David Norman-Schiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doctor's Associates LLC
Represented By: John Matthew Doroghazi
Represented By: David Norman-Schiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manpreet Kaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?