Dunbar v. Jepsen et al
Plaintiff: Timolyn Deneen Dunbar
Defendant: James Duncan, Richard Mahoney, Joseph Pirez, Christopher Walsh, George Jepsen, Marc Heinmiller, Gilbert Valentine, Joseph Pires, Shawn Musial, David Montini, Carlos Vasquez and Stephen Cowf
Case Number: 3:2019cv01163
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: William I Garfinkel
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 17 JUDGMENT, the complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim, and that the case is closed.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 9/17/2019.(Jaiman, R.)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER approving and adopting #9 Recommended Ruling. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 9/12/2019. (Simon, K) Modified on 9/12/2019 (Jaiman, R.). (MODIFIED TO EDIT THE TEXT)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. (Attachments: #1 copy of envelope) (Oliver, T.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Marc Heinmiller, Richard Mahoney, David Montini, Shawn Musial, Stephen Cowf, Carlos Vasquez, Joseph Pires, filed by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. (Oliver, T.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 OBJECTION to #9 Recommended Ruling filed by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. (Oliver, T.)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for by Pro Se Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. (Attachments: #1 copy of envelope) (Oliver, T.)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. (Attachments: #1 copy of envelope) (Oliver, T.)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. Responses due by 9/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 copy of envelope) (Oliver, T.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 RECOMMENDED RULING : For the reasons set forth in the attached Recommended Ruling, the Undersigned recommends that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. sec. 1915(e)(2)(B). This is a Recommended Ruling. Any objection must be filed within 14 days after service. Objections due by 8/22/2019. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 8/8/19.(Cates, S)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. In addition, for the reasons set forth in the Recommended Ruling filed herewith, the Undersigned recommends that this action be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. sec. 1915(e)(2)(b). Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 8/8/19. (Cates, S)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for Motion for in Forma Pauperis including #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 8/1/2019.Motions referred to William I. Garfinkel(Jaiman, R.)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2019. Discovery due by 1/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/3/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/29/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/29/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 ENTERED IN ERROR - Order on Pretrial Deadlines:. Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2019. Discovery due by 1/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/3/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2019.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 8/5/2019 (Fazekas, J.).
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. (Fazekas, J.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Duncan, Marc Heinmiller, George Jepsen, Richard Mahoney, Joseph Pirez, Gilbert Valentine, Christopher Walsh, filed by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunbar v. Jepsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Pirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Jepsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Heinmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Pires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Musial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Montini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Cowf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timolyn Deneen Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?