Stichting PGGM Depositary et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn and Stichting PGGM Depositary
Defendant: Eyal Desheh, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman and Allan Oberman
Case Number: 3:2019cv01173
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Berger on behalf of Stichting PGGM Depositary, Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn (Berger, Daniel)
September 25, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Elman on behalf of Stichting PGGM Depositary, Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn (Elman, Deborah)
September 25, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Park on behalf of Stichting PGGM Depositary, Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn (Park, Jonathan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jonathan D. Park to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5452541) by Stichting PGGM Depositary, Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn. (Zezula, Nathan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Deborah A. Elman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5452537) by Stichting PGGM Depositary, Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn. (Zezula, Nathan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel L. Berger to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5452532) by Stichting PGGM Depositary, Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn. (Zezula, Nathan)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Attorney Jonathan D. Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/23/2019. Signed by Clerk on 9/24/2019. (Oliver, T.)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Attorney Deborah A. Elman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/23/2019. Signed by Clerk on 9/24/2019. (Oliver, T.)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Attorney Daniel L. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/23/2019. Signed by Clerk on 9/24/2019. (Oliver, T.)
September 23, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jonathan D. Park to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5452541) by Stichting PGGM Depositary, Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of)(Zezula, Nathan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Deborah A. Elman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5452537) by Stichting PGGM Depositary, Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of)(Zezula, Nathan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel L. Berger to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5452532) by Stichting PGGM Depositary, Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support)(Zezula, Nathan)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER on Stay: Upon the occurrence of any of: (1) the dismissal of the Teva Securities Litigation, with prejudice, by this Court, and exhaustion of all appeals related thereto; or (2) the denial of any motion to dismiss the Teva Securities Litigation; or (3) either of the Parties to this action provides ten (10) day notice that they no longer consent to the voluntary stay of the PGGM Litigation, then the Parties shall within twenty-one (21) days meet and confer and propose to the Court a schedule for further proceedings, including deadlines for the filing of any amendment to, or motion to dismiss or response to the Complaint, or a further deferment of or motion to stay proceedings. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 9/11/2019. (Kaas, E.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn. (Zezula, Nathan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stichting PGGM Depositary. (Zezula, Nathan)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion to Stay Action. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 9/4/2019. (Simon, K)
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jordan D. Hershman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5422630) by Eyal Desheh, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman. (Hershman, Jordan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan D. Hershman on behalf of Eyal Desheh, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman (Hershman, Jordan)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Attorney Jordan D. Hershman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/3/2019. Signed by Clerk on 9/4/2019. (Oliver, T.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay Action by Eyal Desheh, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman.Responses due by 9/24/2019 (O'Toole, Jill)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Stefan R Underhill for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/03/2019.(Gould, K.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jordan D. Hershman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5422630) by Eyal Desheh, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman. (O'Toole, Jill)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.. (O'Toole, Jill)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill M. O'Toole on behalf of Eyal Desheh, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman (O'Toole, Jill)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Eyal Desheh, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nathan Craig Zezula* *Lueker Mott Zezula LLC* *750 East Main Street 6th Floor* *Stamford, CT 06902*. (Fazekas, J.)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice of Related Case filed by Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn, Stichting PGGM Depositary, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn, Stichting PGGM Depositary, #5 Standing Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 7/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/28/2019. Discovery due by 1/29/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/4/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
July 30, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Hushin, Z.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case by All Plaintiffs (Zezula, Nathan)
July 30, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Zezula, Nathan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5379636.), filed by Stichting PGGM Depositary, Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Civil Cover Sheet)(Zezula, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stichting PGGM Depositary et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eyal Desheh
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigurdur Olafsson
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erez Vigodman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Oberman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stichting Pensioenfonds Zorg En Welzijn
Represented By: Nathan Craig Zezula
Represented By: Deborah Elman
Represented By: Daniel L. Berger
Represented By: Jonathan Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stichting PGGM Depositary
Represented By: Nathan Craig Zezula
Represented By: Deborah Elman
Represented By: Daniel L. Berger
Represented By: Jonathan Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?