New Leaf Data Services, LLC v. Humboldt Marijuana Exchange, LLC
Plaintiff: New Leaf Data Services, LLC
Defendant: Humboldt Marijuana Exchange, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01234
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause why the court should not dismiss this case for failure to prosecute as a result of the plaintiff's failure to move for a default entry against the defendant. Show Cause Response due by 10/15/2019 Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/30/2019.(Lewis, D)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Leaf Data Services, LLC. Humboldt Marijuana Exchange, LLC served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Ball, Stephen)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Humboldt Marijuana Exchange, LLC, filed by New Leaf Data Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Ball, Stephen)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (Reis, Julia)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Humboldt Marijuana Exchange, LLC * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stephen F.W. Ball, Jr.* *Whitmyer IP Group LLC* *600 Summer Street* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Reis, Julia)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by New Leaf Data Services, LLC, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by New Leaf Data Services, LLC, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, #6 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 8/9/2019.(Reis, Julia)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/8/2019.(Reis, Julia)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/8/2019.(Reis, Julia)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/8/2019.(Reis, Julia)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/7/2019 Discovery due by 2/7/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 3/13/2020 Signed by Clerk on 8/8/2019.(Reis, Julia)
August 8, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
August 8, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Humboldt Marijuana Exchange, LLC. (Ball, Stephen)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Leaf Data Services, LLC. (Ball, Stephen)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement against Humboldt Marijuana Exchange, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5391982.), filed by New Leaf Data Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ball, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Leaf Data Services, LLC v. Humboldt Marijuana Exchange, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Leaf Data Services, LLC
Represented By: Stephen F.W. Ball, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humboldt Marijuana Exchange, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?