Hillbury v. University of Hartford et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Hillbury
Defendant: University of Hartford and Ellucian Company L.P.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01236
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 8/1/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2010; Joint Status Report due by 2/5/2020; Joint Trial Brief due by 10/1/2020; Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/12/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Michael P. Shea (Johnson, D.)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' #18 Rule 26(f) Report and orders the deadlines set forth in the attached. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/1/2019. (Ram, Megha)
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses by University of Hartford.(McKenna, Elizabeth)
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses by Ellucian Company L.P..(McKenna, Elizabeth)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McKenna, Elizabeth)
September 16, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Ellucian Company L.P. to 9/23/2019; University of Hartford to 9/23/2019. (Johnson, D.)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The #16 motion for extension is GRANTED. Defendants shall have until September 23, 2019 to file an answer or motion addressed to the complaint. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/16/2019. (Ram, Megha)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 23, 2019 to file an answer or motion addressed to the complaint by Ellucian Company L.P., University of Hartford. (McKenna, Elizabeth)
August 21, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings:( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/22/2019), Answer deadline updated for Ellucian Company L.P. to 9/16/2019; University of Hartford to 9/16/2019. (Johnson, D.)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The #14 motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall have until September 16, 2019 to file an answer or motion addressed to the complaint. In addition, the parties shall file a Rule 26(f) Report by September 22, 2019 in accordance with the local rules. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/21/2019. (Ram, Megha)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 16, 2019 to file answer or motion addressed to the complaint by Ellucian Company L.P., University of Hartford. (McKenna, Elizabeth)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Andrew Hillbury. (Carnabuci, Andrew)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Brooks Farley Carnabuci on behalf of Andrew Hillbury (Carnabuci, Andrew)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice (Other) filed by Ellucian Company L.P., University of Hartford, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ellucian Company L.P., #10 Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ellucian Company L.P., University of Hartford, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by University of Hartford, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Ellucian Company L.P., University of Hartford, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Ellucian Company L.P., University of Hartford, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Ellucian Company L.P., University of Hartford Signed by Clerk on 08/09/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/08/2019. (Peterson, M)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/08/2019. (Peterson, M)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/7/2019. Discovery due by 2/7/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/13/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/08/2019. (Peterson, M)
August 8, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori B. Alexander on behalf of Ellucian Company L.P., University of Hartford (Alexander, Lori) Modified on 8/8/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ellucian Company L.P.. (McKenna, Elizabeth)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by University of Hartford. (McKenna, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/8/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Ellucian Company L.P., University of Hartford of Pending Motions (McKenna, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/8/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Ellucian Company L.P., University of Hartford of Statement Regarding Removed Case (McKenna, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/8/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth R. McKenna on behalf of Ellucian Company L.P., University of Hartford (McKenna, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/8/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ellucian Company L.P., University of Hartford from Superior Court, case number HHD-CV19-6114447-D. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5392453, filed by Ellucian Company L.P., University of Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(McKenna, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/8/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillbury v. University of Hartford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Hartford
Represented By: Elizabeth R. McKenna
Represented By: Lori B. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellucian Company L.P.
Represented By: Elizabeth R. McKenna
Represented By: Lori B. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Hillbury
Represented By: Andrew Brooks Farley Carnabuci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?