Hamilton et al v. Banks et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline P. Hamilton and Hamilton
Defendant: Banks, Schools, Churches, Hospitals, Sheriffs, Neighborhoods, Employments, Police Dept., Landlords, Family, Section 8 and Housing Authority
Case Number: 3:2019cv01246
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: William I Garfinkel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/30/2019. (Conde, Djenab)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER adopting #9 Recommended Ruling. For the reasons explained in Judge Garfinkel's recommended ruling, the Court orders the case dismissed for failing to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915(e)(2)(B). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the case.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/30/2019. (Conde, Djenab)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Jacqueline P. Hamilton re #9 RECOMMENDED RULING Dismissing #1 Complaint filed by Jacqueline P. Hamilton 4 Pages. (Corriette, M.)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 RECOMMENDED RULING: For the reasons set forth in the attached Recommended Ruling, the Undersigned recommends that plaintiff's #1 Complaint be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915(e)(2)(B). This is a Recommended Ruling. 4 Pages. Any objection must be filed within 14 days after service. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 9/12/19.(Esposito, A.)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis based upon the financial affidavit provided, but for the reasons set forth in the Recommended Ruling filed herewith, the Undersigned recommends that this action be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 9/12/19. (Esposito, A.)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for including #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/5/2019.Motions referred to William I. Garfinkel(Conde, Djenab)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/14/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/14/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/13/2019. Discovery due by 2/13/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/19/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/14/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jacqueline P. Hamilton. (Fazekas, J.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jacqueline P. Hamilton. (Fazekas, J.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jacqueline P. Hamilton.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton et al v. Banks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline P. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Churches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neighborhoods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landlords
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Section 8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?