Johnson v. Metro-North Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Frank Johnson
Defendant: Metro-North Railroad Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01255
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Metro-North Railroad Company.(Fineman, Beck)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/17/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. (Garcia, Angela)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Following a telephonic status conference held on September 23, 2019, the Court adopts the following pre-trial schedule in this case: - Damages analysis is due by December 6, 2019. - Designations of expert witnesses are due by February 7, 2020 (Plaintiff) and July 17, 2020 (Defendant). - Depositions of experts shall be completed by June 12, 2020 (Plaintiff) and September 11, 2020 (Defendant). - Depositions of fact witnesses shall be completed by April 3, 2020. - Discovery shall close by September 11, 2020. - The Court will convene a post-discovery telephonic status conference on September 17, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. - Dispositive motions are due by November 6, 2020. - Joint trial memorandum is due by December 11, 2020, or 30 days after the Court rules on any dispositive motion. - The parties trial ready date is January 24, 2021, or 30 days after the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/23/2019.(Garcia, Angela)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for Telephonic Rule 26(f) Conference held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Calendar Call held on 9/23/2019.(Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Garcia, Angela)
September 13, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562 (Garcia, Angela)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fitzgerald, Stephen)
August 26, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/7/2019 (Perez, J.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Beck S. Fineman on behalf of Metro-North Railroad Company (Fineman, Beck)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Metro-North Railroad Company waiver sent on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/11/2019 filed by Frank Johnson. (Goetsch, Charles)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Protective Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen J. Fitzgerald on behalf of Frank Johnson, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Frank Johnson Signed by Clerk on 8/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2019. Discovery due by 2/11/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 12, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Anastasio, F.)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Fitzgerald on behalf of Frank Johnson (Fitzgerald, Stephen)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro-North Railroad Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5395308.), filed by Frank Johnson.(Goetsch, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Metro-North Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-North Railroad Company
Represented By: Beck S. Fineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Johnson
Represented By: Stephen J. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Charles C. Goetsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?