USA v. $45,002.00 in United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $45,002.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Andrea Pepe
Case Number: 3:2019cv01263
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David Christopher Nelson on behalf of USA (Nelson, David)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/14/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 13, 2019 Docket Entry Correction re #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, Entered in Error. (Murphy, Tatihana)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/13/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/13/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR-Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2019. Discovery due by 2/11/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/13/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) Modified filed date on 8/14/2019 (Murphy, Tatihana). Modified on 8/14/2019 (Murphy, Tatihana).
August 13, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $45,002.00 in United States Currency, filed by USA.(Hughes, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $45,002.00 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Andrea Pepe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $45,002.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: John B. Hughes
Represented By: David Christopher Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?