Ramirez Escobar v. Midland Credit Management
Plaintiff: Jose Ramirez Escobar
Defendant: Midland Credit Management
Case Number: 3:2019cv01264
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Concepcion A. Montoya. Signed by Clerk on 10/8/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Concepcion A. Montoya to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5473649) by Midland Credit Management. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Schuyler Kraus in Support of the Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Concepcion A. Montoya, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Concepcion A. Montoya for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Montoya, Concepcion)
September 27, 2019 Docket Entry Correction re 6 Notice of Appearance - Document filed in wrong case. (Imbriani, Susan)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Schuyler B Kraus on behalf of Midland Credit Management (Kraus, Schuyler)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Jose Ramirez Escobar, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/13/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/13/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/12/2019. Discovery due by 2/12/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/18/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 13, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5398004.), filed by Jose Ramirez Escobar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zemel, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez Escobar v. Midland Credit Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management
Represented By: Concepcion A Montoya
Represented By: Schuyler B Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ramirez Escobar
Represented By: Daniel Zemel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?