United National Insurance Company v. MNR Hotel Group/363 Roberts Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United National Insurance Company
Defendant: MNR Hotel Group/363 Roberts Partners, LLC and DNA Lodging East Hartford, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01265
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United National Insurance Company.(Campbell, Kathleen)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Meade on behalf of MNR Hotel Group/363 Roberts Partners, LLC (Meade, Paul)
September 23, 2019 Set Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 10/11/2019 (Freberg, B)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Doc. #11). The Court GRANTS the motion for extension of time until October 11, 2019, to file an amended complaint that alleges additional facts concerning the citizenship of the defendant parties. In the event that defendants fail to respond to further queries and fail to file a timely appearance and answer or other response, plaintiff may file a motion for default entry pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/23/2019. (Freberg, B)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 10, 2019 Respond to Order to Show Cause by United National Insurance Company. (Campbell, Kathleen)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A. Campbell on behalf of United National Insurance Company (Campbell, Kathleen)
August 22, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Show Cause Response due by 9/20/2019 (Pesta, J.)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 20, 2019 to show cause. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/22/19. (Pesta, J.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 20, 2019 7 Order to Show Cause,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, by United National Insurance Company. (Donovan, John)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE BASIS FOR FEDERAL JURISDICTION. Plaintiff has filed a diversity complaint against two companies that are limited liability companies. For purposes of diversity jurisdiction, the citizenship of a limited liability company (LLC) is determined by reference to the citizenship of each of its members. See, e.g., Wise v. Wachovia Securities, LLC, 450 F.3d 265, 267 (7th Cir. 2006); Handelsman v. Bedford Village Ltd. Partnership, LLC, 213 F.3d 48, 51-52 (2d Cir. 2000). The complaint fails to identify the citizenship of each of the defendant's members. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by August 29, 2019, that properly identifies the membership and citizenship of each of the members of the defendant parties. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/15/2019. (Amended Pleadings due by 8/29/2019)(Freberg, B)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *DNA Lodging East Hartford, LLC, MNR Hotel Group/363 Roberts Partners, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Anthony Donovan, III* *Sloane and Walsh, LLP* *Three Center Plaza, 8th Floor* *Boston, MA 02108*. (Freberg, B)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by United National Insurance Company, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 8/14/2019.(Freberg, B)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/14/2019.(Freberg, B)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/14/2019. (Freberg, B)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/13/2019; Discovery due by 2/13/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 3/19/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/14/2019. (Freberg, B)
August 14, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Anastasio, F.)
August 14, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Donovan, John)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5398382.), filed by United National Insurance Company.(Donovan, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United National Insurance Company v. MNR Hotel Group/363 Roberts Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MNR Hotel Group/363 Roberts Partners, LLC
Represented By: Paul D. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DNA Lodging East Hartford, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United National Insurance Company
Represented By: John Anthony Donovan, III
Represented By: Kathleen A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?