Plourde v. Sirois Tool Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mark Plourde
Defendant: Sirois Tool Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01269
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Sirois Tool Company, Inc..(Thompson, Melicent)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sirois Tool Company, Inc.. (Thompson, Melicent)
September 11, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Sirois Tool Company, Inc. to 9/19/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to 9/11/2019 to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/11/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 19, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Complaint by Sirois Tool Company, Inc.. (Thompson, Melicent)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. O'Donnell on behalf of Sirois Tool Company, Inc. (O'Donnell, Elizabeth)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Melicent B. Thompson on behalf of Sirois Tool Company, Inc. (Thompson, Melicent)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Plourde. Sirois Tool Company, Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Carnabuci, Andrew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Sirois Tool Company, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Andrew Brooks Farley Carnabuci* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Mark Plourde, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 08/16/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/14/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/14/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/13/2019. Discovery due by 2/13/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/19/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/14/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
August 14, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
August 14, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Sirois Tool Company, Inc. (Carnabuci, Andrew) Modified text on 8/15/2019 to update party (Anastasio, F.).
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sirois Tool Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5399604.), filed by Mark Plourde.(Carnabuci, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plourde v. Sirois Tool Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Plourde
Represented By: Andrew Brooks Farley Carnabuci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sirois Tool Company, Inc.
Represented By: Melicent B. Thompson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?