Harris v. General Computer Resources, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stacey L. Harris
Defendant: Cirtec Medical, LLC and General Computer Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01273
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Post-Discovery Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/21/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all parties are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. (Conde, Djenab)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: Following a Rule 26(f) Telephonic Scheduling Conference, the Court adopts the following pre-trial schedule: Initial disclosures are due by November 1, 2019. Plaintiffs joinder of parties and amended pleadings are due by October 11, 2019. Defendantss joinder of parties is due by October 25, 2019, and responses to amended pleadings are due by November 8, 2019.Designation of experts is due by February 14, 2020 (Plaintiff) and April 10, 2020 (Defendant). Expert depositions are due by March 13, 2020 (Plaintiff) and May 15, 2020 (Defendant).Discovery shall close by May 15, 2020. Post-discovery status conference shall be May 21, 2020 at 10:00 A.M. Once all parties are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. Dispositive motions are due by July 24, 2020. Joint trial memorandum is due by September 4, 2020 if no dispositive motion is filed, or 30 days after the Court rules on any dispositive motion.Trial ready date is October 5, 2020 if no dispositive motion is filed, or 30 days after the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/1/2019.(Conde, Djenab)
October 1, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Rule 26(f) Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/1/2019. Total Time: 0 hours and 4 minutes(Court Reporter S. Montini.). (Conde, Djenab)
September 30, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. RESET FROM 10/1/2019 11:30 AM Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2019 12:00 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all parties are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. (Conde, Djenab)
September 27, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Rule 26(f) Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2019 11:30 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all parties are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562.(Conde, Djenab)
September 26, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Michaud, Megan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Cirtec Medical, LLC.(Jachimowski, Christy)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/23/2019. (Perez, J.)
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by General Computer Resources, Inc..(Skubas, Sarah)
August 26, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/30/2019 (Perez, J.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth B. Walton on behalf of Cirtec Medical, LLC (Walton, Kenneth)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christy E. Centeno on behalf of Cirtec Medical, LLC (Centeno, Christy)
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Stacey L. Harris (Cicchiello, Emanuele)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stacey L. Harris. (Michaud, Megan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #11 Standing Protective Order, #4 Notice Re Certificate of Filing & Service of Petition for Removal filed by General Computer Resources, Inc., #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal filed by General Computer Resources, Inc., #10 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Jessica Lynn Vizvary on behalf of General Computer Resources, Inc., #6 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 16, 2019 In Which to Respond to Complaint filed by General Computer Resources, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Sarah R. Skubas on behalf of General Computer Resources, Inc., #5 Notice of Pending Motions filed by General Computer Resources, Inc., #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by General Computer Resources, Inc., #3 Notice of Statement Regarding Removal filed by General Computer Resources, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/14/2019. Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 15, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Anastasio, F.)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lynn Vizvary on behalf of General Computer Resources, Inc. (Vizvary, Jessica)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Computer Resources, Inc.. (Skubas, Sarah)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 16, 2019 In Which to Respond to Complaint by General Computer Resources, Inc.. (Skubas, Sarah)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by General Computer Resources, Inc. of Pending Motions (Skubas, Sarah)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by General Computer Resources, Inc. Re Certificate of Filing & Service of Petition for Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Skubas, Sarah)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by General Computer Resources, Inc. of Statement Regarding Removal (Skubas, Sarah)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah R. Skubas on behalf of General Computer Resources, Inc. (Skubas, Sarah)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Computer Resources, Inc. from Hartford Superior Court, case number HHD-cv-19-6114953-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5400796, filed by General Computer Resources, Inc..(Skubas, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. General Computer Resources, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cirtec Medical, LLC
Represented By: Christy E. Jachimowski
Represented By: Kenneth B. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Computer Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah R. Skubas
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Vizvary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey L. Harris
Represented By: Megan Leigh Michaud
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?