Loan Acquisitions, LLC v. Franze
Plaintiff: Loan Acquisitions, LLC
Defendant: Frank Franze
Case Number: 3:2019cv01277
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Bozek, M.)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER dismissing the case in accordance with #7 the voluntary dismissal, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/2/2019.(Sondergeld, C.)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of dismissing case by All Plaintiffs (Elstein, Bruce)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Loan Acquisitions, LLC. Frank Franze served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Elstein, Bruce)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Frank Franze* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bruce L. Elstein* *Goldman, Gruder & Woods, LLC* *105 Technology Drive* *Trumbull, CT 06611*. (Bozek, M.)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, and #1 Complaint filed by Loan Acquisitions, LLC. Signed by Clerk on 8/16/2019.(Bozek, M.)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/16/2019.(Bozek, M.)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2019. Discovery due by 2/15/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/21/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/16/2019.(Bozek, M.)
August 16, 2019 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Walker, J.)
August 16, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Frank Franze. (Elstein, Bruce) Modified on 8/16/2019 to edit party (Walker, J.).
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frank Franze ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5401631.), filed by Loan Acquisitions, LLC.(Elstein, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loan Acquisitions, LLC v. Franze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Franze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loan Acquisitions, LLC
Represented By: Bruce L. Elstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?