Shackleford v. Saul
Plaintiff: Dave Shackleford
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv01278
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Referring Judge: Robert A Richardson
2 Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405dc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 9/26/19.(Blue, A.)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Andrew M. Saul, Dave Shackleford. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson. This matter has been transferred to a magistrate judge. All non-efiled submissions should be filed at the seat of court where the magistrate judge presides. The case number will remain the same, but must be followed by the magistrate judge's initials. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 9/26/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Dave Shackleford Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Yelner, Olia)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REMINDER: STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James Desir on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Desir, James)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without prepayment of fees, costs or security therefor, which includes an affidavit regarding his current financial circumstances. See Doc. #2 -1. In plaintiff's affidavit, he states that he has a dependent minor child, and has been unemployed since January 2015. See id. at 2-3. Plaintiff resides in a shelter, has no income, and no assets. See id. at 4-5. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 8/20/19. (Dowie, C)
August 16, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Andrew M. Saul to 10/15/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 8/16/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 8/16/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 8/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.)
August 16, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill and Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam (Oliver, T.)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dave Shackleford. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Yelner, Olia)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, Social Security Administration, filed by Dave Shackleford.(Yelner, Olia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shackleford v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: James Desir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Shackleford
Represented By: Olia Yelner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?