K. v. East Haddam Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: K.
Defendant: Brian Reas, Bryan Perry, Josh Martin and East Haddam Board of Education
Case Number: 3:2019cv01283
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by East Haddam Board of Education, Josh Martin, Bryan Perry, Brian Reas.(Myers, Sheldon)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheldon D. Myers on behalf of East Haddam Board of Education, Josh Martin, Bryan Perry, Brian Reas (Myers, Sheldon)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Josh Martin waiver sent on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; Brian Reas waiver sent on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; East Haddam Board of Education waiver sent on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; Bryan Perry waiver sent on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019 filed by K.. (Spencer, Courtney)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *East Haddam Board of Education, Josh Martin, Bryan Perry, Brian Reas* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Courtney Paige Spencer* *Law Office of Courtney P. Spencer, LLC* *100 Riverview Center, Suite 120* *Middletown, CT 06457*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL : Counsel initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by K., #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 08/19/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 08/16/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2019 Discovery due by 2/15/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 3/21/2020 Signed by Clerk on 08/16/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 16, 2019 Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 16, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Spencer, Courtney)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Attorney's Fees against East Haddam Board of Education, Josh Martin, Bryan Perry, Brian Reas ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5403183.), filed by Mrs. K. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Spencer, Courtney) Modified parties on 8/19/2019 (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K. v. East Haddam Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Reas
Represented By: Sheldon D. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Perry
Represented By: Sheldon D. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Martin
Represented By: Sheldon D. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Haddam Board of Education
Represented By: Sheldon D. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.
Represented By: Courtney Paige Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?