Thibault et al v. CBS Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Thibault and Lorraine Shepard
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC, CBS Corp., General Electric Company and Crane Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01286
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Crane Co. Statement of Compliance with Standing Orders in Removed Cases (Lyons, Thomas)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of General Electric Company (Sheldon, Tara)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Co., #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Crane Co., #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Crane Co., #7 Protective Order, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Crane Co. Signed by Clerk on 08/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/19/2019. (Peterson, M)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/19/2019. (Peterson, M)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/18/2019. Discovery due by 2/18/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/24/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/19/2019. (Peterson, M)
August 19, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Lyons, Thomas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Crane Co. re: Notice of Pending Motions (Lyons, Thomas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Crane Co. (Lyons, Thomas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Co. from Bridgeport Superior Court, case number FBT-CV-19-6088103-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5404485, filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2: Friemoth, #3 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 1, #4 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 2, #5 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 3, #6 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 4, #7 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 5, #8 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 6, #9 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 1, #10 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 2, #11 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 3, #12 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 4, #13 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 5, #14 Exhibit 5: State Notice of Removal, #15 Certificate of Service)(Lyons, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thibault et al v. CBS Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Tara Anne Sheldon
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Thibault
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Shepard
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?