Sherman v. Light Rigging Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Sherman
Defendant: Light Rigging Company, LLC and Robert Bradway
Case Number: 3:2019cv01290
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Robert Bradway, Light Rigging Company, LLC.(McQuade, Joseph)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Victor A. Bolden for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2019.(Hushin, Z.)
September 16, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Robert Bradway to 10/14/2019; Light Rigging Company, LLC to 10/14/2019. (Imbriani, Susan)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time until October 14, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/16/2019. (Welles, T.)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 14, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Complaint by Robert Bradway, Light Rigging Company, LLC. (McQuade, Joseph)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Light Rigging Company, LLC. (McQuade, Joseph)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. McQuade on behalf of Robert Bradway, Light Rigging Company, LLC (McQuade, Joseph)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Sherman. Light Rigging Company, LLC served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Steigman, Todd)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Sherman. Robert Bradway served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Steigman, Todd)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Light Rigging Company, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Todd D. Steigman* *Madsen, Prestley & Parenteau, LLC-HTFD* *402 Asylum Street* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Robert Bradway* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Todd D. Steigman* *Madsen, Prestley & Parenteau, LLC-HTFD* *402 Asylum Street* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Lisa Sherman, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Standing Order for Fair Labor Standards Act Cases Not Pleaded as Collective Actions Signed by Clerk on 8/20/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER FOR FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT CASES NOT PLEADED AS COLLECTIVE ACTIONS Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/20/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/20/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/20/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/19/2019. Discovery due by 2/19/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/25/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/20/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 20, 2019 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Oliver, T.)
August 20, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Light Rigging Company, LLC. (Steigman, Todd)
August 20, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Robert Bradway. (Steigman, Todd)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Bradway, Light Rigging Company, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5405708.), filed by Lisa Sherman.(Steigman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherman v. Light Rigging Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Light Rigging Company, LLC
Represented By: Joseph W. McQuade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bradway
Represented By: Joseph W. McQuade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Sherman
Represented By: Todd D. Steigman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?