Green v. McMahon et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Green
Defendant: Brian McMahon, City of Milford and Brien McMahon
Case Number: 3:2019cv01304
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Curtis Green.(Rosen, David)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting the plaintiff's #12 motion to amend/correct the complaint and caption. The plaintiff shall file the amended complaint on or before September 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 9/20/2019. (Covello, Alfred)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint & Caption by Curtis Green.Responses due by 10/8/2019 (Rosen, David)
September 16, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Brian McMahon to 10/14/2019; City of Milford to 10/14/2019. See 11 Order. (Bozek, M.)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting the #10 consent motion for extension of time. The time for the defendants to respond to the complaint is hereby extended to and including October 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 9/16/2019. (Sondergeld, C.)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/14/2019 Answer #1 Complaint by Brian McMahon, City of Milford. (Tallberg, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James Newhall Tallberg on behalf of Brian McMahon, City of Milford (Tallberg, James)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Curtis Green. (Rosen, David)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander T. Taubes on behalf of Curtis Green (Taubes, Alexander)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Curtis Green. Brian McMahon served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; City of Milford served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Rosen, David)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Brian McMahon, City of Milford* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David N. Rosen* *David N. Rosen & Associates, P.C.* *400 Orange St* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Bozek, M.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, and #1 Complaint filed by Curtis Green Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2019.(Bozek, M.)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/22/2019.(Bozek, M.)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/21/2019. Discovery due by 2/21/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2019.(Bozek, M.)
August 22, 2019 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.)
August 22, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Rosen, David)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5409144.), filed by Curtis Green.(Rosen, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. McMahon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Green
Represented By: David N. Rosen
Represented By: Alexander T. Taubes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian McMahon
Represented By: James Newhall Tallberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Milford
Represented By: James Newhall Tallberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brien McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?