Colon v. Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center
Plaintiff: Zachary Colon
Defendant: Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center
Case Number: 3:2019cv01333
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam: Pre-Settlement Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/24/2019. 5 minutes. (Katz, S.)
October 17, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2019, at 10:30AM, before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam. This case has been referred to Judge Merriam for a settlement conference. She will hold a pre-conference telephone call with counsel on 10/24/2019, at 10:30AM. A firm date for the settlement conference will be set during that telephone call. The Court requires all named parties and any other persons necessary to achieve full settlement (such as insurance representatives) to attend the settlement conference in person. Therefore, counsel must consult with their clients and other necessary parties prior to the telephone call to determine any dates on which they will be unavailable in the next 180 days. Counsel should also have their own calendars available to facilitate scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the conference to be productive. Please use the following dial-in for this call: (888)278-0296; Access Code: 2280867. (Katz, S.)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for Settlement Conference Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/17/2019.(D'Amato, Joseph)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER ON JOINT TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/17/2019.(D'Amato, Joseph)
October 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Conference Line: 888-278-0296; Access Code: 8077899. (D'Amato, Joseph)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. The Court has reviewed the Parties' #17 Rule 26(f) Report. It is Approved, Adopted, and So Ordered, except that Dispositive Motions and the Parties' Joint Trial Memorandum shall be filed in accordance with the deadlines and procedures set forth below. Pursuant to Local Rule 16(b), the Court orders as follows: The Plaintiff shall move to amend the pleadings or move to join additional parties by October 25, 2019. The Defendant shall move to join additional parties by November 8, 2019. The Defendant shall respond to any amended pleadings by November 15, 2019. Discovery shall be completed by May 15, 2020. Dispositive motions, if any (see Local Rule 56(c)), shall be filed by July 15, 2020. The Joint Trial Memorandum shall be filed by July 15, 2020, unless dispositive motions are filed, in which case it shall be filed within 45 days of the Court's ruling thereon. The Joint Trial Memorandum shall comport with this Court's standing order, which will be separately docketed. A telephonic status conference is scheduled for June 10, 2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Set Deadlines/Hearings: For Plaintiff, Motions to Join Additional Parties due by October 25, 2019For Defendant, Motions to Join Additional Parties due by November 8, 2019For Plaintiff, Amended Pleadings due by October 25, 2019For Defendant, Response to any Amended Pleadings due by November 15, 2019Discovery due by May 15, 2020 Dispositive Motions due by July 15, 2020 Joint Trial Memorandum due by July 15, 2020, unless dispositive motions are filed, in which case it shall be filed within 45 days of the Court's ruling thereonTelephonic Status Conference set for June 10, 2020 at 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/17/2019.(D'Amato, Joseph)
October 15, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bovee, Tanya)
October 10, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center to 11/6/2019. (Gould, K.)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall file a response to the Complaint by November 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/10/19. (Bempong, Tracy)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 6, 2019 To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint 11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center. (Bovee, Tanya)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya Ann Bovee on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center (Bovee, Tanya)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Zachary Colon. (Michaud, Megan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Leigh Michaud on behalf of Zachary Colon (Michaud, Megan)
September 5, 2019 Answer Deadline updated for Defendant to October 7, 2019. (Bempong, Tracy)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by October 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/5/2019. (Bempong, Tracy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Defendant's Statement Regarding Removal filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 7, 2019, on Consent, to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, #5 Notice of No Pending Motions filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by David C. Salazar-Austin on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, #9 Standing Protective Order, #3 Certificate of Filing and Service of Petition for Removal filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center Signed by Clerk on 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/29/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/29/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/28/2019. Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/3/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/29/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
August 29, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 7, 2019, on Consent, to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center. (Salazar-Austin, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center re #1 Notice of Removal Defendant's Notice of No Pending Motions (Salazar-Austin, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center re #1 Notice of Removal Defendant's Statement Regarding Removal (Salazar-Austin, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center re #1 Notice of Removal Certificate of Filing and Service of Petition for Removal (Salazar-Austin, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Salazar-Austin on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center (Salazar-Austin, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center from Connecticut Superior Court, case number HTID-CV19-6115314-S. Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5418298, filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center.(Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colon v. Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center
Represented By: David C. Salazar-Austin
Represented By: Tanya Ann Bovee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Colon
Represented By: Andrew Brooks Farley Carnabuci
Represented By: Megan Leigh Michaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?