Valley Presbyterian Hospital et al v. Azar
Plaintiff: Sanford USD Medical Center, Danbury Hospital, UF Health Jacksonville, St. Francis Hospital and Medical Center, Waterbury Hospital, Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital Association, St. Cloud Hospital, John D Archbold Memorial Hosp, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Coxhealth, Salem Hospital, Lawrence and Memorial Hospital, University Medical Center, Middlesex Hospital, William W. Backus Hospital, Monongahela Valley Hospital, Halifax Med Ctr, Naples Community Hospital, Norwalk Hospital Assoc, Stamford Hospital, University of Michigan Health System, Hospital of Central Connecticut, Baptist St. Anthony's Health System, John Dempsey Hospital, Saint Vincent Health Center and Shands Jacksonville Medical Center
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 3:2019cv01336
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Alex M. Azar, II to 11/5/2019. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and attachments, Corporate disclosure statement, order on pretrial deadlines, electronic filing order, standing protective order, notice to counsel and pro se parties (Dkts. 1-7) served on U.S. Attorney for the D. Ct. on 09/10/2019, filed by Baptist St. Anthony's Health System, Coxhealth, Danbury Hospital, Halifax Med Ctr, Hospital of Central Connecticut, John D Archbold Memorial Hosp, John Dempsey Hospital, Lawrence and Memorial Hospital, Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital Association, Middlesex Hospital, Monongahela Valley Hospital, Naples Community Hospital, Norwalk Hospital Assoc, Saint Vincent Health Center, Salem Hospital, Sanford USD Medical Center, St. Cloud Hospital, St. Francis Hospital and Medical Center, Stamford Hospital, UF Health Jacksonville, University Medical Center, University of Michigan Health System, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Waterbury Hospital, William W. Backus Hospital. (Bernard, Richard)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and attachments, Corporate disclosure statement, order on pretrial deadlines, electronic filing order, standing protective order, notice to counsel and pro se parties (Dkts. 1-7) served on Alex M. Azar and Attorney General of United States on 09/09/2019, filed by Baptist St. Anthony's Health System, Coxhealth, Danbury Hospital, Halifax Med Ctr, Hospital of Central Connecticut, John D Archbold Memorial Hosp, John Dempsey Hospital, Lawrence and Memorial Hospital, Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital Association, Middlesex Hospital, Monongahela Valley Hospital, Naples Community Hospital, Norwalk Hospital Assoc, Saint Vincent Health Center, Salem Hospital, Sanford USD Medical Center, St. Cloud Hospital, St. Francis Hospital and Medical Center, Stamford Hospital, UF Health Jacksonville, University Medical Center, University of Michigan Health System, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Waterbury Hospital, William W. Backus Hospital. (Bernard, Richard)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Alex M. Azar, II* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Richard J. Bernard* *Foley & Lardner LLP - NY* *90 Park Ave.* *New York, NY 10016*. This corrects previous summons of which the incorrect answer deadline was set. Government dft has 60 days to file answer. (Pesta, J.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Alex M. Azar, II* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Richard J. Bernard* *Foley & Lardner LLP - NY* *90 Park Ave.* *New York, NY 10016*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement,,,, filed by Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital Association, UF Health Jacksonville, Monongahela Valley Hospital, St. Cloud Hospital, Waterbury Hospital, Coxhealth, Lawrence and Memorial Hospital, John D Archbold Memorial Hosp, Saint Vincent Health Center, Sanford USD Medical Center, Baptist St. Anthony's Health System, William W. Backus Hospital, John Dempsey Hospital, Halifax Med Ctr, Naples Community Hospital, University of Michigan Health System, Danbury Hospital, Salem Hospital, Norwalk Hospital Assoc, Hospital of Central Connecticut, St. Francis Hospital and Medical Center, University Medical Center, Middlesex Hospital, Stamford Hospital, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, #1 Complaint,,, filed by Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital Association, UF Health Jacksonville, Monongahela Valley Hospital, St. Cloud Hospital, Waterbury Hospital, Coxhealth, Lawrence and Memorial Hospital, John D Archbold Memorial Hosp, Saint Vincent Health Center, Sanford USD Medical Center, Baptist St. Anthony's Health System, John Dempsey Hospital, William W. Backus Hospital, University of Michigan Health System, Naples Community Hospital, Halifax Med Ctr, Danbury Hospital, Salem Hospital, Hospital of Central Connecticut, Norwalk Hospital Assoc, St. Francis Hospital and Medical Center, University Medical Center, Middlesex Hospital, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Stamford Hospital, #5 Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 08/30/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 08/29/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 08/29/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/28/2019 Discovery due by 2/28/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 4/3/2020 Signed by Clerk on 08/29/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 29, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baptist St. Anthony's Health System, Coxhealth, Danbury Hospital, Halifax Med Ctr, Hospital of Central Connecticut, John D Archbold Memorial Hosp, John Dempsey Hospital, Lawrence and Memorial Hospital, Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital Association, Middlesex Hospital, Monongahela Valley Hospital, Naples Community Hospital, Norwalk Hospital Assoc, Saint Vincent Health Center, Salem Hospital, Sanford USD Medical Center, St. Cloud Hospital, St. Francis Hospital and Medical Center, Stamford Hospital, UF Health Jacksonville, University Medical Center, University of Michigan Health System, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Waterbury Hospital, William W. Backus Hospital identifying Other Affiliate UConn Health for John Dempsey Hospital; Other Affiliate Yale New Haven Health for Lawrence and Memorial Hospital; Other Affiliate Nuvance Health for Danbury Hospital, Norwalk Hospital Assoc; Other Affiliate Ardent Health Services for Baptist St. Anthony's Health System; Corporate Parent Hartford Healthcare for Hospital of Central Connecticut, William W. Backus Hospital; Other Affiliate Trinity Health for St. Francis Hospital and Medical Center. (Bernard, Richard)
August 29, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Alex M. Azar, II. (Bernard, Richard)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5418556.), filed by Middlesex Hospital, Monongahela Valley Hospital, Lawrence and Memorial Hospital, Waterbury Hospital, Coxhealth, Sanford USD Medical Center, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital Association, University Medical Center, St. Cloud Hospital, Naples Community Hospital, UF Health Jacksonville, Danbury Hospital, William W. Backus Hospital, St. Francis Hospital and Medical Center, Halifax Medical Center, University of Michigan Health System, John D. Archbold Memorial Hospital, Saint Vincent Health Center, Norwalk Hospital Association, The Hospital of Central Connecticut, Baptist St. Anthony's Health System, Stamford Hospital, Salem Hospital, John Dempsey Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bernard, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valley Presbyterian Hospital et al v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanford USD Medical Center
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danbury Hospital
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UF Health Jacksonville
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Francis Hospital and Medical Center
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterbury Hospital
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital Association
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Cloud Hospital
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D Archbold Memorial Hosp
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Presbyterian Hospital
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coxhealth
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salem Hospital
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence and Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University Medical Center
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Middlesex Hospital
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William W. Backus Hospital
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monongahela Valley Hospital
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halifax Med Ctr
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naples Community Hospital
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norwalk Hospital Assoc
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stamford Hospital
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Michigan Health System
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hospital of Central Connecticut
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist St. Anthony's Health System
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dempsey Hospital
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Vincent Health Center
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shands Jacksonville Medical Center
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?