Michael Kors, LLC v. C.G.C. Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Kors, LLC
Defendant: Richard Lebov, Digsby, Taylor & Hobbes, LLC, John Does 1-100, Charles Cheslock, Sr., C.G.C. Enterprises, Inc., John Does and Charles Cheslock
Case Number: 3:2019cv01364
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Charles Cheslock by Richard Lebov, Digsby, Taylor & Hobbes, LLC.(Hillis, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Stanton Hillis on behalf of Richard Lebov (Hillis, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Stanton Hillis on behalf of Digsby, Taylor & Hobbes, LLC (Hillis, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Notice, Disclosure Statement, Report, Civil Cover Sheet, Chambers' Practices, Protective Order, Order on Deadlines served on Richard Lebov; Digsby, Taylor & Hobbes, LLC on 10/01/2019, filed by Michael Kors, LLC. (Pastore, Joseph)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Charles Cheslock waiver sent on 9/11/2019, answer due 11/10/2019; C.G.C. Enterprises, Inc. waiver sent on 9/11/2019, answer due 11/10/2019 filed by Michael Kors, LLC. (Pastore, Joseph)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Velez, F.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *C.G.C. Enterprises, Inc., Charles Cheslock, Digsby, Taylor & Hobbes, LLC, Richard Lebov* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph Pastore* *Pastore & Dailey, LLC* *4 High Ridge Park 3rd Fl.* *Stamford, CT 06905*. (Velez, F.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Standing Protective Order, #3 Exhibit filed by Michael Kors, LLC, #1 Complaint filed by Michael Kors, LLC, #4 Exhibit filed by Michael Kors, LLC, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Michael Kors, LLC, #8 Order Re: Chambers Practices. Signed by Clerk on 9/4/2019. (Velez, F.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT Report by Michael Kors, LLC re #1 Complaint. (Pastore, Joseph)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT Civil Cover Sheet by Michael Kors, LLC re #1 Complaint. (Pastore, Joseph)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/3/2019. (Velez, F.)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/3/2019. (Velez, F.)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/3/2019. (Velez, F.)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2019; Discovery due by 3/4/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 4/8/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/3/2019. (Velez, F.)
September 3, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
September 3, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to C.G.C. Enterprises, Inc., Charles Cheslock, Sr, Digsby, Taylor & Hobbes, LLC, Richard Lebov. (Pastore, Joseph)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Michael Kors, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Capri Holdings Limited for Michael Kors, LLC. (Pastore, Joseph)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number CCTDC-5423306.), filed by Michael Kors, LLC.(Pastore, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Kors, LLC v. C.G.C. Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lebov
Represented By: Michael Stanton Hillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digsby, Taylor & Hobbes, LLC
Represented By: Michael Stanton Hillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Cheslock, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.G.C. Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Cheslock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kors, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Pastore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?