Morton et al v. Griffin
Plaintiff: Christopher Morton and Kelly Morton
Defendant: Arnitrice Griffin
Case Number: 3:2019cv01365
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 33 EXHIBITS - 47-53 by Arnitrice Griffin re #7 AMENDED Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 54-55)(Payton, R.)
October 25, 2019 Filing 32 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re: #31 Notice of Appeal. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this transmission: none (Fanelle, N.)
October 25, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #29 Judgment, by Arnitrice Griffin. (Fanelle, N.)
September 26, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Freberg, B)
September 26, 2019 Filing 30 Case remanded to Connecticut Superior Court, Judicial District of Danbury. (Freberg, B)
September 26, 2019 Filing 29 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Christopher Morton, Kelly Morton against Arnitrice Griffin.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2019.(Freberg, B)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE REMAND TO STATE COURT (Doc. #21 ). The Clerk of Court shall immediately remand this case to state court without waiting the ten days per local rule 83.7. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 09/26/2019. (Mahler-Haug, A)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REGARDING PENDING MOTIONS. In light of the Court's order remanding this case to state court, Doc. #21 , Defendant Griffin's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, Doc. # #2 , #20 , motion to participate in electronic filing, Doc. #19 , motion to appoint counsel, Doc. #23 , and motion for extension of time, Doc. #24 , are each DENIED AS MOOT. Those motions submitted under seal shall remain under seal, for the compelling reasons stated in the motions and for which sealing is narrowly tailored to serve. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/26/2019. (Webley, A)
September 25, 2019 Filing 27 EXHIBITS 40-46 by Arnitrice Griffin re #7 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exh 41, #2 Exh 42, #3 Exh 43, #4 Exh 44, #5 Exh 45, #6 Exh 46)(Imbriani, Susan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 25 Defendant's Response and Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. filed by Arnitrice Griffin. (Imbriani, Susan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Defendant's Response and Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. by Arnitrice Griffin. (Imbriani, Susan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 23 SEALED MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Arnitrice Griffin. (Imbriani, Susan)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. In light of this Court's remand of this action back to the Connecticut Superior Court (Doc. #21 ), plaintiff's motion for extension of time (Doc. #15 ) is DENIED as moot. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 09/25/2019. (Mahler-Haug, A)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT. Because the Court lacks federal jurisdiction over this case, as explained in the accompanying ruling, the Court forthwith REMANDS this action back to the Connecticut Superior Court, Judicial District of Danbury. The Clerk of Court shall forthwith remand and close this case. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 09/25/2019. (Mahler-Haug, A)
September 17, 2019 Filing 20 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Arnitrice Griffin. (Freberg, B)
September 17, 2019 Filing 19 SEALED MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Arnitrice Griffin. (Freberg, B)
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 Sealed Document: Consent to Electronic Notice by Self-Represented Litigant by Arnitrice Griffin. (Freberg, B)
September 17, 2019 Filing 17 EXHIBITS 23-29 by Arnitrice Griffin re #7 Amended Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 30-39)(Payton, R.)
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO 6 Order to Show Cause by Arnitrice Griffin filed by Arnitrice Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Payton, R.)
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 17, 2019 to file response to 6 Order to Show Cause by Arnitrice Griffin. (Payton, R.)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 Supplemental RESPONSE re 6 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,, Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Christopher Morton, Kelly Morton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Buzzi, Andrew)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Buzzi, Jr on behalf of Christopher Morton, Kelly Morton (Buzzi, Andrew)
September 12, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/28/2019. (Gutierrez, Y.)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 EXHIBITS 16-22 by Arnitrice Griffin re #7 AMENDED Notice of Removal. (Payton, R.)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 Appearance Self Represented Party by Arnitrice Griffin (Payton, R.)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION OF RELATED PARTIES by Arnitrice Griffin (Payton, R.)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by Arnitrice Griffin (Payton, R.)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Removal 30 Day Statute of Limitation by Arnitrice Griffin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Payton, R.)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Arnitrice Griffin from Superior Court, Danbury,, case number CV-19-6032774-S., filed by Arnitrice Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Exhibit 3-5, #3 Exhibit 6-15, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Payton, R.)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED. Defendant Griffin has filed a notice of removal to remove a state court eviction action to this Court. The Court has ascertained from a review of the publicly available state court docket that plaintiffs Christopher and Kelly Morton filed a complaint for eviction against Griffin that alleges solely state law claims and that alleges that the plaintiffs and defendants are all citizens of the State of Connecticut. See Morton v. Griffin, DBD-CV19-6032774-S (Danbury JD). "A suit arises under the Constitution and laws of the United States only when the plaintiff's statement of his own cause of action shows that it is based upon those laws or that Constitution." Beneficial Nat. Bank v. Anderson, 539 U.S. 1, 6 (2003). Under the well-pleaded complaint rule, the fact that a defendant may interpose federal law as a defense to a state law cause of action does not give rise to federal-question jurisdiction. See, e.g., Caterpillar Inc. v. Williams, 482 U.S. 386, 39293 (1987). Notwithstanding Griffin's allegations that the apartment rental involves the federal Section 8 program, it appears that there is no basis for federal jurisdiction because the state court complaint does not allege a federal law claim and because there is no diversity jurisdiction. See Bank of Am., N.A. v. Derisme, No. 3:19-CV-00020 (JAM), 2019 WL 156936, at *1 (D. Conn. Jan. 10, 2019) (remanding state court foreclosure action that was improperly removed to federal court in absence of any basis for federal court jurisdiction). Defendants Griffin shall file any response to this order to show cause by September 13, 2019, to show why this Court should not forthwith remand this action to Connecticut state court. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/6/2019. Show Cause Response due by 9/13/2019.(Freberg, B)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/3/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/3/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2019. Discovery due by 3/4/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/8/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/3/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Arnitrice Griffin. (Fazekas, J.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Arnitrice Griffin from Superior Court, Danbury, filed by Arnitrice Griffin.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morton et al v. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnitrice Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Morton
Represented By: Andrew J. Buzzi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Morton
Represented By: Andrew J. Buzzi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?