Negron v. Meriden et al
Plaintiff: Jose Negron
Defendant: Griffin, Lounsbury, Meriden Police Department, Morin, City of Meriden, Welles, Doe, Ficara, DelMastro, Flannery, Rodriguez, Jeffry W. Cossette, Ouellette, Ladyga, Raszcewski and Robinson
Case Number: 3:2019cv01395
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 17 First MOTION for More Definite Statement by Jeffry W. Cossette, DelMastro, Doe, Ficara, Flannery, Griffin, Ladyga, Lounsbury, City of Meriden, Meriden Police Department, Morin, Ouellette, Raszcewski, Robinson, Rodriguez, Welles.Responses due by 11/28/2019 (Roberts, Richard)
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Dellolio on behalf of City of Meriden (Dellolio, Stephanie)
October 11, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Jeffry W. Cossette to 11/10/2019; DelMastro to 11/10/2019; Doe to 11/10/2019; Ficara to 11/10/2019; Flannery to 11/10/2019; Griffin to 11/10/2019; Ladyga to 11/10/2019; Lounsbury to 11/10/2019; City of Meriden to 11/10/2019; Meriden Police Department to 11/10/2019; Morin to 11/10/2019; Ouellette to 11/10/2019; Raszcewski to 11/10/2019; Robinson to 11/10/2019; Rodriguez to 11/10/2019; Welles to 11/10/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 11/10/2019 to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Any further motion must comply with the good cause standard of the Local Rule. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/11/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time until November 10, 2019 To Answer Complaint by Jeffry W. Cossette, DelMastro, Doe, Ficara, Flannery, Griffin, Ladyga, Lounsbury, City of Meriden, Meriden Police Department, Morin, Ouellette, Raszcewski, Robinson, Rodriguez, Welles. (Roberts, Richard)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmine Annunziata on behalf of Jeffry W. Cossette, DelMastro, Doe, Ficara, Flannery, Griffin, Ladyga, Lounsbury, City of Meriden, Meriden Police Department, Morin, Ouellette, Raszcewski, Robinson, Rodriguez, Welles (Annunziata, Carmine)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Regina P Armon on behalf of Jeffry W. Cossette, DelMastro, Doe, Ficara, Flannery, Griffin, Ladyga, Lounsbury, City of Meriden, Meriden Police Department, Morin, Ouellette, Raszcewski, Robinson, Rodriguez, Welles (Armon, Regina)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Roberts on behalf of Jeffry W. Cossette, DelMastro, Doe, Ficara, Flannery, Griffin, Ladyga, Lounsbury, City of Meriden, Meriden Police Department, Morin, Ouellette, Raszcewski, Robinson, Rodriguez, Welles (Roberts, Richard)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose Negron re #1 Complaint, (Mowad, George)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Negron. Jeffry W. Cossette served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; DelMastro served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; Doe served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; Ficara served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; Flannery served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; Griffin served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; Ladyga served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; Lounsbury served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; City of Meriden served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; Meriden Police Department served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; Morin served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; Ouellette served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; Raszcewski served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; Robinson served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; Rodriguez served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; Welles served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Mowad, George)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by George G. Mowad, II on behalf of Jose Negron (Mowad, George)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Jeffry W. Cossette, DelMastro, Ficara, Flannery, Griffin, Ladyga, Lounsbury, City of Meriden, Meriden Police Department, Morin, Ouellette, Raszcewski, Robinson, Rodriguez, Welles* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *George G. Mowad, II* *Yamin & Grant* *83 Bank St.* *Waterbury, CT 06702*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Protective Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Jose Negron, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by Jose Negron, #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 09/10/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn Lee Koachman on behalf of Jose Negron (Koachman, Jaclyn)
September 10, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Mowad, George)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 09/09/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 09/09/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/8/2019. Discovery due by 3/10/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/14/2020. Signed by Clerk on 09/09/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
September 9, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffry W. Cossette, DelMastro, Doe, Ficara, Flannery, Griffin, Ladyga, Lounsbury, City of Meriden, Meriden Police Department, Morin, Ouellette, Raszcewski, Robinson, Rodriguez, Welles (Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5430323), filed by Jose Negron.(Anastasio, F.) Modified on 9/9/2019 to include filing fee paid (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Negron v. Meriden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Represented By: Carmine Annunziata
Represented By: Richard A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lounsbury
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Represented By: Carmine Annunziata
Represented By: Richard A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meriden Police Department
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Represented By: Carmine Annunziata
Represented By: Richard A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morin
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Represented By: Carmine Annunziata
Represented By: Richard A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Meriden
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Represented By: Carmine Annunziata
Represented By: Stephanie Dellolio
Represented By: Richard A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welles
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Represented By: Carmine Annunziata
Represented By: Richard A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Represented By: Carmine Annunziata
Represented By: Richard A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ficara
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Represented By: Carmine Annunziata
Represented By: Richard A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DelMastro
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Represented By: Carmine Annunziata
Represented By: Richard A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flannery
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Represented By: Carmine Annunziata
Represented By: Richard A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodriguez
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Represented By: Carmine Annunziata
Represented By: Richard A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffry W. Cossette
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Represented By: Carmine Annunziata
Represented By: Richard A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ouellette
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Represented By: Carmine Annunziata
Represented By: Richard A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladyga
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Represented By: Carmine Annunziata
Represented By: Richard A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raszcewski
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Represented By: Carmine Annunziata
Represented By: Richard A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson
Represented By: Regina P Armon
Represented By: Carmine Annunziata
Represented By: Richard A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Negron
Represented By: George G. Mowad, II
Represented By: Jaclyn Lee Koachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?