Berlin v. Greene et al
Plaintiff: Leonard A Berlin
Defendant: AbleTripod LLC and Arthur B Greene
Counter Claimant: L.A. Care Industries LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01410
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Leonard A Berlin by AbleTripod LLC, Arthur B Greene, L.A. Care Industries LLC.(Rye, Michael)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Tasia E. Perkins on behalf of AbleTripod LLC, Arthur B Greene, L.A. Care Industries LLC (Perkins, Tasia)
October 21, 2019 Answer deadline updated for AbleTripod LLC to 11/8/2019; Arthur B Greene to 11/8/2019; L.A. Care Industries LLC to 11/8/2019. (Lewis, D)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until November 8, 2019 to Answer Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/21/2019. (Lewis, D)
October 18, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/2/2019 (DeRubeis, B.)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until November 8, 2019 to Answer Complaint by AbleTripod LLC, Arthur B Greene, L.A. Care Industries LLC. (Rye, Michael)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Rye on behalf of AbleTripod LLC, Arthur B Greene, L.A. Care Industries LLC (Rye, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leonard A Berlin. AbleTripod LLC served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019; Arthur B Greene served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019; L.A. Care Industries LLC served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Allentuch, Simon)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (Reis, Julia)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *AbleTripod LLC, Arthur B Greene, L.A. Care Industries LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Simon Irving Allentuch* *Aeton Law Partners LLP* *101 Centerpoint Drive, Ste 115* *Middletown, CT 06457*. (Reis, Julia)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by L.A. Care Industries LLC, Leonard A Berlin, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2019. (Reis, Julia)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/10/2019. (Reis, Julia)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/10/2019. (Reis, Julia)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/10/2019. (Reis, Julia)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/9/2019. Discovery due by 3/11/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/10/2019. (Reis, Julia)
September 10, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
September 10, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Allentuch, Simon)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5433138.), filed by Leonard A Berlin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Registrations))(Allentuch, Simon) Modified on 9/10/2019 to correct filed by/filed against parties(Walker, J.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berlin v. Greene et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbleTripod LLC
Represented By: Tasia E. Perkins
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur B Greene
Represented By: Tasia E. Perkins
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: L.A. Care Industries LLC
Represented By: Tasia E. Perkins
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard A Berlin
Represented By: Simon Irving Allentuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?