In Re: Clinton Nurseries, Inc., et al
Not Yet Classified: US Trustee
Appellant: Clinton Nurseries of Maryland, Inc., Clinton Nurseries of Florida, Inc. and Clinton Nurseries, Inc.
Interested Party: Kim L. McCabe
Appellee: William K. Harrington
Case Number: 3:2019cv01433
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Referring Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until December 9, 2019, for the Appellants and January 22, 2020 for the UST File Briefs by Clinton Nurseries of Florida, Inc., Clinton Nurseries of Maryland, Inc., Clinton Nurseries, Inc.. (Blau, Christopher)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Michael P. Shea for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/18/2019.(Gutierrez, Y.)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Clinton Nurseries of Florida, Inc., Clinton Nurseries of Maryland, Inc., Clinton Nurseries, Inc. re #11 MOTION for Certification Order Supplement to Motion for Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Henzy, Eric)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Certification Order by Clinton Nurseries of Florida, Inc., Clinton Nurseries of Maryland, Inc., Clinton Nurseries, Inc.. (Henzy, Eric)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:19-CV-01428-MPS by Clinton Nurseries of Florida, Inc., Clinton Nurseries of Maryland, Inc., Clinton Nurseries, Inc..Responses due by 11/6/2019 (Henzy, Eric)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to counsel/parties regarding briefing Signed by Clerk on 10/10/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Fanelle, N.)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Ann Levene on behalf of William K. Harrington, US Trustee (Levene, Beth)
September 19, 2019 Docket Entry Correction re 5 Notice 83.1, docket entry entered in error, please disregard (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR-NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 09/11/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) Modified on 9/19/2019 (Nuzzi, Tiffany).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 09/11/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 09/11/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 17-31897, filed by Clinton Nurseries of Maryland, Inc., Clinton Nurseries, Inc., Clinton Nurseries of Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ruling and Order #835)(Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Clinton Nurseries, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Represented By: Beth Ann Levene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Clinton Nurseries of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Alexander Henzy
Represented By: Christopher Holden Blau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Clinton Nurseries of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Alexander Henzy
Represented By: Christopher Holden Blau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Clinton Nurseries, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Alexander Henzy
Represented By: Christopher Holden Blau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kim L. McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: William K. Harrington
Represented By: Robert J Schneider, Jr
Represented By: Beth Ann Levene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?