Illinois Tool Works Inc. v. J-B Weld Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Illinois Tool Works Inc.
Defendant: J-B Weld Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01434
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant J-B Weld's Partial Motion to Dismiss by J-B Weld Company, LLC.Responses due by 11/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Polansky, Kevin)
November 1, 2019 Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 11/1/2019. Total Time: 5 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OF CONFERENCE and ORDER. On November 1, the Court held a telephone conference with counsel concerning the motion hearing scheduled for November 6. The parties will proceed on the basis of the record before the Court without the need for live testimony at this time. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/1/2019. (Al-Jarani, Y.)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. The Court GRANTS defendant's motion to be excused (Doc. #35 ). It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/1/2019. (Al-Jarani, Y.)
November 1, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2019 a 4:00 PM in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the conference call to Chambers (203)773-2105 with all counsel on the line. (Gutierrez, Y.)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE (Doc. #36 ). The parties' joint motion for a telephone conference is GRANTED. The Court will hold a telephone conference with counsel on November 1, 2019 at 4:00PM. Plaintiff shall initiate call. Once all parties are on the line, please call chambers at (203) 773-2105. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/1/2019. (Webley, A)
November 1, 2019 Filing 36 Consent MOTION for telephonic Conference by Illinois Tool Works Inc.. (Diemand, Timothy)
October 31, 2019 Filing 35 Motion for Order to be Excused from Attending a Hearing Scheduled for November 6, 2019 by J-B Weld Company, LLC Assented-To Application of Counsel to be Excused from Attending a Hearing Scheduled for November 6, 2019 (Polansky, Kevin) Modified on 11/1/2019 to change to motion (Freberg, B).
October 15, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacquelyn Prom on behalf of Illinois Tool Works Inc. (Prom, Jacquelyn)
October 15, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley L. Cohn on behalf of Illinois Tool Works Inc. (Cohn, Bradley)
October 11, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Ekhoff on behalf of Illinois Tool Works Inc. (Ekhoff, Jessica)
October 9, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil C Jones on behalf of J-B Weld Company, LLC (Jones, Neil)
October 9, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Summer on behalf of J-B Weld Company, LLC (Summer, Ashley)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Attorney Neil C. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #27 Motion for Attorney Ashley B. Summer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 10/8/2019. (Freberg, B)
October 7, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashly Boesche on behalf of Illinois Tool Works Inc. (Boesche, Ashly)
October 4, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ashley B. Summer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5471055) by J-B Weld Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Summer in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit B - Summer USDC Cert of Good Standing)(Polansky, Kevin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Attorney(s) Neil C. Jones to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5471038) by J-B Weld Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jones in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit B - Jones USDC Cert of Good Standing)(Polansky, Kevin)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Attorney Bradley L. Cohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #18 Motion for Attorney Jacquelyn Rose McPeak to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #19 Motion for Attorney Ashly I. Boesche to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #20 Motion for Attorney Jessica A. Ekhoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 10/3/2019. (Freberg, B)
October 3, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Motion Hearing re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .( Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer) (Gutierrez, Y.)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time until November 4, 2019 J-B Weld's response to #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/2/2019. (Gutierrez, Y.)
October 3, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Illinois Tool Works Inc.. (Diemand, Timothy)
October 2, 2019 Answer deadline updated for J-B Weld Company, LLC to 11/4/2019. (Gutierrez, Y.)
October 1, 2019 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until November 4, 2019 J-B Weld's response to #1 Complaint by J-B Weld Company, LLC. (Polansky, Kevin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jessica A. Ekhoff to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5460554) by Illinois Tool Works Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration Jessica A. Ekhoff, #2 Exhibit A Good Standing Certificate)(Diemand, Timothy)
September 27, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ashly I. Boesche to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5460539) by Illinois Tool Works Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration Ashly Boesche, #2 Exhibit A Good Standing Certificate)(Diemand, Timothy)
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jacquelyn Rose McPeak to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5460518) by Illinois Tool Works Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of J. McPeak, #2 Exhibit A Good Standing Certificate)(Diemand, Timothy)
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bradley L. Cohn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5460497) by Illinois Tool Works Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of B. Cohn, #2 Exhibit A Good Standing Certificate)(Diemand, Timothy)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE REPLY. Plaintiff may file any reply to defendant's opposition memorandum (Doc. #14) by October 3, 2019. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/26/2019. (Freberg, B)
September 25, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/11/2019. (Gutierrez, Y.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J-B Weld Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent JBW Holdings, LLC for J-B Weld Company, LLC. (Polansky, Kevin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 Memorandum in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by J-B Weld Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Carlton E. Hanson Declaration)(Polansky, Kevin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. Polansky on behalf of J-B Weld Company, LLC (Polansky, Kevin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on J-B Weld Company, LLC on September 13, 2019, filed by Illinois Tool Works Inc.. (Diemand, Timothy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (Reis, Julia)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *J-B Weld Company, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Timothy Andrew Diemand* *Wiggin & Dana-Htfd* *20 Church St.* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Reis, Julia)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Illinois Tool Works Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Illinois Tool Works Inc., #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Illinois Tool Works Inc., #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Illinois Tool Works Inc., 5 Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/13/2019. (Reis, Julia)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE OBJECTION OR RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Plaintiff shall immediately serve defendant with process and its motion for preliminary injunction and shall file confirmation of such service on the docket. Defendant shall file any objection or other response to the motion for preliminary injunction by September 25, 2019. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/13/19.(Gutierrez, Y.)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/12/2019. (Reis, Julia)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/12/2019. (Reis, Julia)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/11/2019. Discovery due by 3/13/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/12/2019. (Reis, Julia)
September 12, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Illinois Tool Works Inc..Responses due by 10/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Frank Agrafojo, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Diemand, Timothy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Illinois Tool Works Inc.. (Diemand, Timothy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Andrew Diemand on behalf of Illinois Tool Works Inc. (Diemand, Timothy)
September 12, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to J-B Weld Company, LLC. (Diemand, Timothy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J-B Weld Company, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5437718.), filed by Illinois Tool Works Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Declaration of Frank Agrafojo)(Diemand, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Illinois Tool Works Inc. v. J-B Weld Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Tool Works Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Diemand
Represented By: Ashly Boesche
Represented By: Jessica Ekhoff
Represented By: Jacquelyn Prom
Represented By: Bradley L. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J-B Weld Company, LLC
Represented By: Ashley Summer
Represented By: Neil C Jones
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?