Riley v. Norwalk et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Riley
Defendant: City of Norwalk, Inc., Norwalk Public Schools District, Norwalk Board of Education and City of Norwalk
Case Number: 3:2019cv01436
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Barbara Riley of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Collective Action)(Leach, Carlos)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Security for Costs. The defendant(s) having made application to the Clerk of Court for an order requiring the plaintiff(s) to deposit or file a bond with sufficient surety in the sum of $500.00 pursuant to Local Rule 83.3(a) of the Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States District of Connecticut, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff(s) herein file a bond as security for costs in this action within thirty (30) days from this date. Absent objection, the "demand" is granted. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/29/2019. (Lewis, D)
October 28, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos V. Leach on behalf of Barbara Riley (Leach, Carlos)
October 25, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam: Telephonic Pre-Settlement Scheduling Conference held on 10/25/2019. 15 minutes. (Katz, S.)
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 Second NOTICE by Barbara Riley Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Notice of filing consent)(Daugherty, Ryan)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/22/2019 to file answer and meeting report. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/22/2019. (Lewis, D)
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 First NOTICE by Barbara Riley Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Daugherty, Ryan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 16 Sealed Offer of Compromise by City of Norwalk, Norwalk Board of Education, Norwalk Public Schools District Offer of Judgment. (Spahr, M.)
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/22/2019 to file answer and meeting report by City of Norwalk, Norwalk Board of Education, Norwalk Public Schools District. (Spahr, M.)
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2019, at 3:30PM, before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam. This case has been referred to Judge Merriam for a settlement conference. She will hold a pre-conference telephone call with counsel on 10/25/2019, at 3:30PM. A firm date for the settlement conference will be set during that telephone call. The Court requires all named parties and any other persons necessary to achieve full settlement (such as insurance representatives) to attend the settlement conference in person. Therefore, counsel must consult with their clients and other necessary parties prior to the telephone call to determine any dates on which they will be unavailable in the next 180 days. Counsel should also have their own calendars available to facilitate scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the conference to be productive. Please use the following dial-in for this call: (888)278-0296; Access Code: 2280867. (Katz, S.)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for settlement conference SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/21/2019.(Lewis, D)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:19cv04137 by City of Norwalk, Norwalk Board of Education, Norwalk Public Schools District.Responses due by 11/1/2019 (Spahr, M.)
October 10, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/22/2019 (DeRubeis, B.)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Janet C. Hall for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2019.(Hushin, Z.)
October 7, 2019 Answer deadline updated for City of Norwalk to 10/22/2019; Norwalk Board of Education to 10/22/2019; Norwalk Public Schools District to 10/22/2019. (Imbriani, Susan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Exhibits served on City of Norwalk, Norwalk Board of Education, Norwalk Public Schools District on 10/01/2019, filed by Barbara Riley. (Daugherty, Ryan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Security for Costs by City of Norwalk, Norwalk Board of Education, Norwalk Public Schools District. (Spahr, M.)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Jeffry Spahr on behalf of City of Norwalk, Norwalk Board of Education, Norwalk Public Schools District (Spahr, M.)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 Consent NOTICE by Barbara Riley (Attachments: #1 Barbara Riley Consent to Join)(Daugherty, Ryan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *City of Norwalk, Norwalk Board of Education, Norwalk Public Schools District* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ryan Darrell Daugherty* *Daugherty Law Group, LLC* *260 Madison Avenue, Ste 8th Floor* *New York, NY 10016*. (Fazekas, J.)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Barbara Riley, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 9/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/11/2019. Discovery due by 3/13/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
September 12, 2019 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Oliver, T.)
September 12, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Daugherty, Ryan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5438167.), filed by Barbara Riley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daugherty, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley v. Norwalk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Norwalk, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norwalk Public Schools District
Represented By: M. Jeffry Spahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norwalk Board of Education
Represented By: M. Jeffry Spahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Norwalk
Represented By: M. Jeffry Spahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Riley
Represented By: Ryan Darrell Daugherty
Represented By: Carlos V. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?