Decormier v. Bray
Plaintiff: Joyce Decormier
Defendant: Jay Bray
Case Number: 3:2019cv01441
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Corby Weaver to be present by Joyce Decormier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Order. Motion denied without prejudice to renew if the case were to proceed to trial. Most, if not all of the proceedings before the court take place through filings, or by telephone conference. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/21/2019. (Lewis, D)
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Case to be Reassigned to Hartford by Joyce Decormier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Murphy, Tatihana)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jay Brey, Benjamen T. Staskiez, filed by Joyce Decormier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/18/2019.(Lewis, D)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/18/2019. (Lewis, D)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 MOTION for by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing Order filed by Joyce Decormier, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Consent to Electronic Notice filed by Joyce Decormier, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Protective Order, #8 Order, #1 Complaint filed by Joyce Decormier, #2 Appearance Self Represented Party filed by Joyce Decormier Signed by Clerk on 09/16/2019. (Peterson, M)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 09/13/2019. (Peterson, M)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 09/13/2019. (Peterson, M)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 09/13/2019. (Peterson, M)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/2019. Discovery due by 3/14/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/18/2020. Signed by Clerk on 09/13/2019. (Peterson, M)
September 13, 2019 Filing fee received from Joyce Decormier: $ 400, receipt number CTXH00016103. (Peterson, M)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Consent to Electronic Notice by Joyce Decormier (Peterson, M)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Joyce Decormier. (Peterson, M)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Appearance Self Represented Party by Joyce Decormier (Peterson, M)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jay Bray, filed by Joyce Decormier. (Peterson, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Decormier v. Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Decormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?