Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC et al v. Valente Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC and BR IP Holder LLC
Defendant: Anna Valente-Krolikowski and Valente Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01452
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Valente Enterprises, Inc., Anna Valente-Krolikowski* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Steven M. Richard* *Nixon Peabody LLP - Htfd* *One Citizen Plaza, Suite 500* *Providence, RI 02903*. (Peterson, M)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs have filed a #3 motion for a preliminary injunction. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of their #1 complaint, the #3 motion, and a copy of this order on all defendants and shall file proof of such service on the docket. Within 21 days of the filing of proof of service, defendants shall show cause why the relief requested in the #3 motion for a preliminary injunction should not issue. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/17/2019. (Hausmann, Amy)
September 17, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Anna Valente-Krolikowski. (Richard, Steven)
September 17, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Valente Enterprises, Inc.. (Richard, Steven)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (Peterson, M)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, #6 Protective Order, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC Signed by Clerk on 09/17/2019. (Peterson, M)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/16/2019. (Peterson, M)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/16/2019. (Peterson, M)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/15/2019. Discovery due by 3/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/21/2020. Signed by Clerk on 09/16/2019. (Peterson, M)
September 16, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC.Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Richard, Steven) Modified on 9/16/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC. (Richard, Steven) Modified on 9/16/2019 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5442339.), filed by Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, BR IP Holder LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Default and Delivery Receipt, #3 Exhibit C: Notice of Termination and Delivery Receipt)(Richard, Steven) Modified on 9/16/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC et al v. Valente Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BR IP Holder LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Valente-Krolikowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valente Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?