USA v. $10,682.00 in United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $10,682.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Talicia Sullivan
Case Number: 3:2019cv01477
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN ON SERVICE by Publication filed by USA. Last publication date 10/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Turbert, Julie)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Stipulated Forfeiture Agreement by Talicia Sullivan, USA. (Turbert, Julie)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $10,682 in United States Currency. (Freberg, B)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT of of Arrest in Rem issued (Freberg, B)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by USA Signed by Clerk on 9/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/20/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/20/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
September 20, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $10,682.00 in United States Currency, filed by USA.(Turbert, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $10,682.00 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Talicia Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Julie G. Turbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,682.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?