Emiabata et al v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, et al
Plaintiff: Philip Emiabata and Sylvia Emiabata
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co., N.A., Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP, Avail I. LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, JP Chase Bank, Morgan Chase Bank Washington Mutual Bank, Specialized Loan Servicing and Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association
Case Number: 3:2019cv01507
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP re #23 MOTION to Dismiss , #24 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hopkins, Shelley)
October 18, 2019 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP. (Hopkins, Shelley)
October 18, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP.Responses due by 11/8/2019 (Hopkins, Shelley)
October 18, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Shelley Hopkins on behalf of Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP (Hopkins, Shelley)
October 18, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Hopkins on behalf of Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP (Hopkins, Mark)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. The Plaintiff's mail has been returned to the Court as undeliverable. It has come to the Court's attention that the Plaintiff has provided different addresses to the Court in his two open cases. See Emiabata v. Seton Healthcare Family, et al., No. 3:18-cv-02057 (D. Conn.) (filed 12/14/2018). The Plaintiff is directed to file a Notice of Change of Address forthwith. If the Plaintiff wishes to receive electronic notices in this matter, he is directed to file a consent to receive electronic notice of filings. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of the appropriate consent form to the Plaintiff together with this Order to both addresses of record. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/11/2019.(Beyerlein, Alexis)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark D. Hopkins ; granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney(s) Shelley Hopkins. Signed by Clerk on 10/10/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Shelley Hopkins to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5478216) by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rich, Brian)
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark D. Hopkins to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5478189) by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rich, Brian)
October 9, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP. (Rich, Brian)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Rich on behalf of Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP (Rich, Brian)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Transfer by Philip Emiabata. (Fanelle, N.)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #11 Ex Parte Motion. See attached order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Sylvia Emiabata as a plaintiff if a pro se or attorney appearance is not filed on her behalf on or before October 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/30/2019. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Philip Emiabata. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Memorandum, #3 Notice, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Fanelle, N.) Modified on 9/30/2019 to lift ex parte restriction(Gould, K.).
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. "The court may issue a preliminary injunction only on notice to the adverse party." Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a)(1). Accordingly, to the extent that the Plaintiffs seek a preliminary injunction, the Court will take up this issue following the service of the Complaint and Summons on the Defendants and their appearance in this matter. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/26/2019.(Beyerlein, Alexis)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Philip Emiabata, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2019. (Oliver, T.)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Morgan Chase Bank Washington Mutual Bank, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Specialized Loan Servicing* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Philip Emiabata* *507 May Street* *Naugatuck, CT 06770*. (Oliver, T.)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *JP Chase Bank* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Philip Emiabata* *507 May Street* *Naugatuck, CT 06770*. (Oliver, T.)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Avail I. LLC, Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Philip Emiabata* *507 May Street* *Naugatuck, CT 06770*. (Oliver, T.)
September 26, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Morgan Chase Bank Washington Mutual Bank, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Specialized Loan Servicing. (Oliver, T.)
September 26, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to JP Chase Bank. (Oliver, T.)
September 26, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Avail I. LLC, Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP. (Oliver, T.)
September 26, 2019 Docket Entry Correction re #3 Protective Order MODIFIED TO NOTE ENTRY HAS BEEN ENTERED IN ERROR AND REDOCKETED AS DOC #4; USED THE INCORRECT JUDGE'S ORDER (Oliver, T.)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/25/2019. (Oliver, T.)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/25/2019. (Oliver, T.)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENTERED IN ERROR - STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 9/25/2019. (Oliver, T.) Modified on 9/26/2019 (Oliver, T.).
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/24/2019 Discovery due by 3/26/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2020 Signed by Clerk on 9/25/2019. (Oliver, T.)
September 25, 2019 Filing fee received from Philip Emiabata: $ 400.00, receipt number CTXB00010595 (Oliver, T.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT/TEMPORARY INJUNCTION against Avail I. LLC, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co., N.A., Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP, JP Chase Bank, Morgan Chase Bank Washington Mutual Bank, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Specialized Loan Servicing, filed by Philip Emiabata. (Oliver, T.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #1 copy of envelope) (Oliver, T.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emiabata et al v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co., N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP
Represented By: Shelley Hopkins
Represented By: Mark Hopkins
Represented By: Brian D. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avail I. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Chase Bank Washington Mutual Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Emiabata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Emiabata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?