USA v. Dorio
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Faith Dorio
Case Number: 3:2019cv01531
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sabato Pellegrino Fiano on behalf of Faith Dorio (Fiano, Sabato)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Faith Dorio served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (Reis, Julia)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Faith Dorio* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lauren M. Nash* *U.S. Attorney's Office-NH* *157 Church St., 25th Floor* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by USA, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 9/30/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/27/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/27/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/26/2019, Discovery due by 3/28/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 5/2/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/27/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 27, 2019 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 27, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Faith Dorio. (Nash, Lauren)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Faith Dorio, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Nash, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Dorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faith Dorio
Represented By: Sabato Pellegrino Fiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Lauren M. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?