In Re: Carter
Not Yet Classified: Webster Bank N.A. and Elizabeth Wyckoff
In Re: Nicholas Carter
Case Number: 3:2019cv01560
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1782
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT Letter to The Honorable Janet Bond Arterton by Nicholas Carter. (Farnsworth, John)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 09/26/19.(Barry, Donna)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector for Document production compliance issues, if needed, before October 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 09/26/19. (Barry, Donna)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet Bond Arterton: Status Conference held on 9/26/2019. Total Time: 30 minutes (Court Reporter Tracy Gow) (Barry, Donna)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Quash after telephonic hearing. For the reasons set forth in the Courts oral ruling on the record on September 26, 2019, Witnesss Motion to Quash is DENIED. She will be granted additional time to comply with the Receivers subpoena #1 . The parties shall advise the Court by letter by 5 p.m. on October 4, 2019 of the arrangements they have agreed to for production or inspection of the subpoenaed documents. Any disputes that may arise which require resolution before October 10, 2019 are to be referred to the Hon. Robert M. Spector. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/26/19. (Gutierrez, A.)
September 24, 2019 A telephonic conference will be held 9/26/19 at 11:00 a.m. Movant's counsel shall initiate the conference call to chambers: 203-773-2737.(Tooker, A.)
September 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Elizabeth Wyckoff.Responses due by 10/12/2019 (Almodovar, Miguel)
September 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Miguel A. Almodovar on behalf of Elizabeth Wyckoff (Almodovar, Miguel)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Compel Subpoena Compliance. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/5/19. (Tooker, A.)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 08/20/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 20, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Ex Parte Application for an Order to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings(paid $47 fee; receipt number ACTDC-5406586) Signed By Sara-Jane Knock filed by Nicholas Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnsworth, John) Modified on 8/21/2019 to correct party and document name (Hushin, Z.).
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Ex Parte Application for an Order to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings(paid $47 fee; receipt number ACTDC-5406586) Signed By Nicholas Carter filed by Nicholas Carter . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Farnsworth, John) Modified on 8/21/2019 to correct party and document name (Hushin, Z.).
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #1 Ex Parte Application for an Order to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings (paid $47 fee; receipt number ACTDC-5406586) filed by Nicholas Carter. (Farnsworth, John) Modified on 8/21/2019 to correct party and document name (Hushin, Z.).
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nicholas Carter. (Farnsworth, John) Modified on 8/21/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 Ex Parte Application for an Order to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings (paid $47 fee; receipt number ACTDC-5406586), filed by Nicholas Carter. Responses due by 9/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Farnsworth, John) Modified on 8/21/2019 to correct document type (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Webster Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Elizabeth Wyckoff
Represented By: Miguel A. Almodovar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Nicholas Carter
Represented By: John A. Farnsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?