Cravens et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Venus Sykes, Donald Boland, Michael DeLuccia, Paul Burpulis, Jarquisha Harris, Ronald Maranto, George Cravens, Scott Moser, Estate of Leticia Zaragoza, Kileen Gromelski, Fernando Zaragoza and Estate of Chris Sykes
Defendant: Glaxosmithkline LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., SanofiAventis U.S. LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Glaxosmithkline plc, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01683
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Stay. The action is stayed pending the decision of the JPML in In Re: Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litig., MDL No. 2924. All deadlines are vacated until further order of the Court. The parties shall notify the Court of the JPML's decision within ten (10) days of the decision. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/5/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
November 27, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Stay and Stipulation to Stay all proceedings pending JPML Determination by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.Responses due by 12/18/2019 (Mancari, Leeanne)
November 18, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chattem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Chattem, Inc.. (Mancari, Leeanne)
November 18, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Mancari, Leeanne)
November 18, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Mancari, Leeanne)
November 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Leeanne Sara Mancari on behalf of Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Mancari, Leeanne)
November 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah A. Westby on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Westby, Sarah)
November 18, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to 12/19/2019; Chattem, Inc. to 12/19/2019; Glaxosmithkline LLC to 12/19/2019; Glaxosmithkline plc to 12/19/2019; Pfizer, Inc. to 12/19/2019; Sanofi US Services Inc. to 12/19/2019; Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC to 12/19/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 12/19/2019 to answer, move or otherwise respond to plaintiffs complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/18/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 19, 2019 respond to Complaint #1 Complaint, by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Fahey, Patrick)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Fahey, Patrick)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Fahey on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Fahey, Patrick)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Moser, Donald Boland, George Cravens, Ronald Maranto, Venus Sykes, Michael DeLuccia, Paul Burpulis, Kileen Gromelski, Fernando Zaragoza, Jarquisha Harris. All Defendants. (Barrett, Christopher)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Barrett on behalf of Donald Boland, Paul Burpulis, George Cravens, Michael DeLuccia, Kileen Gromelski, Jarquisha Harris, Ronald Maranto, Scott Moser, Venus Sykes, Fernando Zaragoza (Barrett, Christopher)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Craig A. Raabe* *Izard, Kindall & Raabe LLP* *29 South Main Street, Suite 305* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Glaxosmithkline LLC, Glaxosmithkline plc* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Craig A. Raabe* * Izard, Kindall & Raabe LLP* *29 South Main Street, Suite 305* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Craig A. Raabe* *Izard, Kindall & Raabe LLP* *29 South Main Street, Suite 305* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Kileen Gromelski, Scott Moser, George Cravens, Jarquisha Harris, Michael DeLuccia, Fernando Zaragoza, Donald Boland, Venus Sykes, Paul Burpulis, Ronald Maranto, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 10/28/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/25/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/25/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/24/2019. Discovery due by 4/25/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/30/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/25/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
October 25, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
October 25, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Raabe, Craig)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5501842.), filed by Scott Moser, Donald Boland, George Cravens, Ronald Maranto, Venus Sykes, Michael DeLuccia, Paul Burpulis, Kileen Gromelski, Fernando Zaragoza, Jarquisha Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Raabe, Craig) Modified text to correct parties on 10/28/2019 (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cravens et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venus Sykes
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Christopher M. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Boland
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Christopher M. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael DeLuccia
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Christopher M. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Burpulis
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Christopher M. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarquisha Harris
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Christopher M. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Maranto
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Christopher M. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Cravens
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Christopher M. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Moser
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Christopher M. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Leticia Zaragoza
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kileen Gromelski
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Christopher M. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Zaragoza
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Christopher M. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Chris Sykes
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glaxosmithkline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Leeanne Sara Mancari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SanofiAventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem, Inc.
Represented By: Leeanne Sara Mancari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glaxosmithkline plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick M. Fahey
Represented By: Sarah A. Westby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Leeanne Sara Mancari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?