Espinal v. Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ana Espinal
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01698
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #6 Electronic Service Documents, Response to Standing Order for Cases Removed from Superior Court filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Kenney, Michael)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc.. (Kenney, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Walmart, Inc., #2 Notice filed by Walmart, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 10/30/19.(Barry, Donna)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/29/19. (Barry, Donna)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/29/19. (Barry, Donna)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/28/2019, Discovery due by 4/29/2020 and Dispositive Motions due by 6/3/2020 Signed by Clerk on 10/29/19. (Barry, Donna)
October 29, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Walmart, Inc. Statement of no Pending Motions (Kenney, Michael)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc. from Connecticut Superior Court, J.D. of Fairfield at Bridgeport, case number FBT-CV19-6090692-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5505324, filed by Walmart, Inc..(Kenney, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinal v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Espinal
Represented By: Ryan S. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?