Barrington et al v. West Haven Bd of Ed et al
Plaintiff: John Barrington, Christine Barrington and Bryan Barrington
Defendant: City of West Haven and West Haven Bd of Ed
Case Number: 3:2019cv01742
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:794
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Reset deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/31/2020 per Dkt. 15 Order. (Shafer, J.)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Joint Motion for Extension of Time until 01/31/2020 to file the Rule 26(f) report. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/19/2019.(Diamond, Matthew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 31, 2020 File Report Pursuant to Rule 26(f) by Christine Barrington. (Feinstein, Andrew)
November 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan P Driscoll on behalf of City of West Haven, West Haven Bd of Ed (Driscoll, Ryan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by City of West Haven, West Haven Bd of Ed.(Buturla, Richard)
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by West Haven Bd of Ed, #4 Notice (Other) filed by West Haven Bd of Ed, City of West Haven, #10 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #9 Standing Protective Order, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by West Haven Bd of Ed, City of West Haven, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Notice (Other) filed by West Haven Bd of Ed, City of West Haven, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Certificate of Service filed by West Haven Bd of Ed, City of West Haven, #2 Notice (Other) filed by West Haven Bd of Ed, City of West Haven. Signed by Clerk on 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Velez, F.)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/5/2019. (Velez, F.)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/5/2019. (Velez, F.)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/5/2019. (Velez, F.)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/4/2020; Discovery due by 5/6/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 6/10/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/5/2019. (Velez, F.)
November 5, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C Buturla on behalf of City of West Haven, West Haven Bd of Ed (Buturla, Richard)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by City of West Haven, West Haven Bd of Ed Notice to Counsel Re Local Rule 5(b) (Buturla, Richard)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by City of West Haven, West Haven Bd of Ed Statement in Response to Standing Order on Removed Cases (Buturla, Richard)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of West Haven, West Haven Bd of Ed (Buturla, Richard) Modified on 11/5/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by City of West Haven, West Haven Bd of Ed Notice of Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buturla, Richard) Modified on 11/5/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by West Haven Bd of Ed, City of West Haven from New Haven Superior Court, case number NNH CV19 6097622 S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5518428, filed by West Haven Bd of Ed, City of West Haven.(Buturla, Richard) Modified on 11/5/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrington et al v. West Haven Bd of Ed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of West Haven
Represented By: Richard J. Buturla
Represented By: Richard C Buturla
Represented By: Ryan P Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Haven Bd of Ed
Represented By: Richard J. Buturla
Represented By: Richard C Buturla
Represented By: Ryan P Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Barrington
Represented By: Andrew Alan Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Barrington
Represented By: Andrew Alan Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Barrington
Represented By: Andrew Alan Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?